Holtzman v. Turza

Plaintiff: Ira Holtzman
Defendant: Gregory P. Turza
Case Number: 1:2008cv02014
Filed: April 9, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2011 230 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/29/2011(ca, ).
October 19, 2010 160 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/19/2010: Mailed notice (gds, )
August 3, 2010 152 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/3/2010: Mailed notice(gds, )
October 14, 2009 108 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/14/2009: Mailed notice (gds, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holtzman v. Turza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Holtzman
Represented By: Brian J Wanca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory P. Turza
Represented By: Eric L. Samore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?