Cruz et al v. City Of Chicago

Plaintiff: Richard Cruz and Pearl Lufrano
Defendant: City Of Chicago and John Haleas
Case Number: 1:2008cv02087
Filed: April 11, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2013 125 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: the Court grants in part Defendants' motion to dismiss 119 and dismisses Plaintiff's two federal claims. The Court dismisses without prejudice Plaintiff's state law claims for intentional infliction of emotion distress (conspiracy); malicious prosecution; and indemnity with leave to re-file in state court within the one-year windowprovided by Illinois law. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 7/24/2013. Mailed notice(tbk, )
February 15, 2011 84 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 2/15/2011: For the reasons stated below, the Court grants Defendant Haleass renewed motion to stay discovery 71 and Defendant City of Chicagos motion to join 77 . The stay of proceedin gs in this case is reinstated at least through the next status date in view of the ongoing criminal matters pertaining to Defendant Haleas. The parties are requested to file a joint status report by 4/30/2011 and this matter is set for further status on 5/5/2011 at 9:00a.m. Mailed by Judge's Staff notice(tbk, )
December 16, 2008 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 12/16/2008.Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz et al v. City Of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Cruz
Represented By: Sally H. Saltzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearl Lufrano
Represented By: Sally H. Saltzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Haleas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?