Pacific Employers Insurance Company v. Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Pacific Employers Insurance Company
Defendant: Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv02180
Filed: April 16, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: John W. Darrah
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2011 371 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by ThirdParty Plaintiff Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc. for judgment (Kennedy, John)
September 21, 2011 370 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 9/21/2011:(lp, )
August 17, 2010 248 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN OPINION entered: Clean Harbors' motion for leave to designate Exhibits 1 & 2 of its motion to compel under seal 234 and National Union's motion to designate its response to Clean Harbors' motion to compel as under seal 239 are granted. Clean Harbors' motion to compel 229 and emergency motion to compel 243 are granted in part and denied in part. Motion hearing set for 8/19/10 at 9:30 a.m are stricken. (For further details, see minute order). Entered by the Honorable Susan E. Cox on 8/17/10: Mailed notice(vkd, )
February 4, 2010 172 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 2/4/2010. (ep, )
October 29, 2009 112 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 10/29/2009. (ep, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Employers Insurance Company v. Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Employers Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce Michael Lichtcsien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?