Sirazi v. Panda Express, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Semir D. Sirazi
Defendant: Panda Express, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc. and Citadel Panda Express, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv02345
Filed: April 24, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Personal Prop.: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Wayne R. Andersen
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2012 306 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/14/12. (mk)
January 18, 2012 237 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Counter Claimant Panda Restaurant Group, Inc. for judgment Panda Restaurant Group's Motion for Entry of Final Judgment on its Counterclaim & for Clarification of its Ruling Regarding Attorney's Fees (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Marconi, Joseph)
January 13, 2012 234 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/13/2012. (mk)
December 13, 2011 228 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/13/2011. (mk)
November 24, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 11/24/2009. Mailed notice(cdh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sirazi v. Panda Express, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Semir D. Sirazi
Represented By: Timothy M Schaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panda Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panda Restaurant Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citadel Panda Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?