BI3, Inc. et al v. Hamor et al

Plaintiff: BI3, Inc. and Kenneth C Tola, Jr.
Defendant: Alan B Hamor, WK Networks, Inc. and CampaignLocal, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv02384
Filed: April 25, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Arlander Keys
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2011 195 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 10/20/2011. (aac, )
March 30, 2011 141 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 3/30/2011. (aac, )
January 3, 2011 138 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 1/3/2011. (aac, )
July 15, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 7/15/2009.(cdy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BI3, Inc. et al v. Hamor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BI3, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph John Zaknoen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth C Tola, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph John Zaknoen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan B Hamor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WK Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CampaignLocal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?