Suppressed v. Suppressed

Plaintiff: Suppressed
Defendant: Suppressed
Case Number: 1:2008cv02390
Filed: April 28, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: James F. Holderman
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2016 101 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable William T. Hart on 2/1/2016:Mailed notice(clw, )
November 30, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order: It is therefore ordered as follows" 1. The Settlement Agreement between the parties shall be filed of record. If the agreement was preceded by mediation, any mediation report shall be filed. 2. The Attorney General of the U nited States and the Attorneys General of the plaintiff States shall each file an analysis of the potential claims of the entities they represent and the reasons why settlement of those claims is fair and equitable including what consideration, if an y, was given to a consent decree relating to the conduct of Stericycle. 3. The parties shall provide information as to notice, if any, to the governmental units affected by the settlement. 4. Relator shall report to the court the amount she is to b e paid from the settlement agreement including attorney fees and costs. 5. The Attorney General of Illinois has requested approval under Illinois law of amounts to be paid to state entities. However, there has been no showing of the basis for such payments and, without an analysis of the claims and the method of distribution, approval will not be granted. 6. No additional distributions of any settlement fund shall be made without approval of the court. 7. The time for filing the information required by this order shall be fixed at a status to be held on December 3, 2015. (For further details see Opinion and Order) Signed by the Honorable William T. Hart on 11/30/2015:Mailed notice(clw, )
March 12, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Relator's motion to strike defendant's affirmative defenses 50 is denied. Signed by the Honorable George M. Marovich on 3/12/2014:Mailed notice(clw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suppressed v. Suppressed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suppressed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suppressed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?