Grede v. The Bank of New York et al

Plaintiff: Frederic J. Grede
Defendant: The Bank of New York and The Bank of New York Mellon Corp.
In Re: Sentinel Management Group Inc
Case Number: 1:2008cv02582
Filed: May 6, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Bankruptcy Withdrawl Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: James B. Zagel
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2014 468 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Signed by the Honorable James B. Zagel on 12/12/2014. Mailed notice(cdh, )
December 10, 2014 465 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL OPINION Signed by the Honorable James B. Zagel on 12/10/2014. Mailed notice(cdh, )
November 3, 2010 352 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed on 11/3/2010.Mailed notice(drw, )
June 12, 2009 132 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed 6/12/2009.Mailed notice(drw, )
January 27, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order regarding motion to dismiss. Signed on 1/27/2009.Mailed notice(drw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grede v. The Bank of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Sentinel Management Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederic J. Grede
Represented By: Catherine L. Steege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York
Represented By: Sean T Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Corp.
Represented By: Sean T Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?