Almy v. Kickert School Bus Line, Inc.

Plaintiff: Robert T. Almy
Defendant: Kickert School Bus Line, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv02902
Filed: May 19, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2013 210 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 1/7/2013. Mailed notice(tbk, )
August 31, 2011 174 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 8/31/2011:For the reasons stated below, Plaintiff Rices objections 173 to Magistrate Judge Denlows August 11 order 165 are overruled. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
August 24, 2011 172 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 8/24/2011: For the reasons stated below, pro se Plaintiff Chrysse Rice's application to proceed in forma pauperis 169 and motion for appointment of counsel 168 are respectfully de nied. Plaintiff is advised that the services of the Courts Pro Se Help Desk are available to her by appointment in the Clerk's Office, 20th Floor, Dirksen Federal Building, if she requires assistance in regard to Court practices and procedures, including in regard to the form for filing a motion for leave to amend the complaint. Please see below for further discussion. Mailed notice(mjc, )
September 11, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/11/2009.Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almy v. Kickert School Bus Line, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert T. Almy
Represented By: Douglas M. Werman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kickert School Bus Line, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?