Toma v. Motley Crue, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Ron Toma
Defendant: Motley Crue, Inc., Signature Network, Inc. and Universal Music Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv03479
Filed: June 17, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Copyright Office
County: Du Page
Presiding Judge: David H. Coar
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:501 Copyright Infringement

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2009 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable David H. Coar: Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary dismissal, this action is dismissed. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (pm, )
May 15, 2009 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Arlander Keys:The Parties having filed a stipulation of dismissal in this case, the status hearing is stricken. All mattters relating to the referral of this action having been resolved, the case is returned to the assigned judge.Case no longer referred to Honorable Arlander Keys., (ac, )
May 15, 2009 34 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ron Toma Stipulation for Dismissal Pursuant to Settlement (Thompson, Lawrence)
April 1, 2009 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Arlander Keys:Status hearing held; continued to 5/15/09 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel for Defendant only appeared and informed the Court that the parties are very close to bringing this case to a resolution. If the Parties file a stipulation of dismissal prior to the next status hearing, the status will be stricken and the parties will not need to appear. (ac, )
March 23, 2009 32 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE Order Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 3/23/2009.(ef, )
March 23, 2009 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Arlander Keys:Enter Stipulated Protective Order. (For further details see separate order.) Mailed notice (ef, )
March 23, 2009 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Arlander Keys:Status hearing held; continued to 4/1/09 at 9:00 a.m. Motion hearing held on Plaintiff Ron Tomas Motion to compel Discovery from Defendant. The parties informed the Court that the issue that gave rise to the motion has been resolved. Therefore, the motion is denied as moot (#26). The parties have informed the Court that they are attempting to bring this case to a resolution. If the Parties file a stipulation of dismissal prior to the next status hearing, the status will be stricken and the parties will not need to appear. (ac, )
March 20, 2009 29 Defendants' Status Conference Statement And Preliminary Opposition To Plainttif's Motion To Compel by Motley Crue, Inc., Signature Network, Inc., Universal Music Group, Inc. (Jirgal, Thomas)
March 12, 2009 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Arlander Keys: The parties have informed the Court that they are close to a settlement in this case. Therefore, pursuant to the request of the parties, the status hearing set for 3/13/09 is stricken and reset to 3/23/09 at 09:00 a.m.Mailed notice (rbf, )
March 6, 2009 27 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Motion by Lawrence E Thompson for presentment of motion to compel 26 before Honorable Arlander Keys on 3/13/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Thompson, Lawrence)
March 6, 2009 26 MOTION by Plaintiff Ron Toma to compel Discovery from Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Thompson, Lawrence)
February 27, 2009 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable David H. Coar:Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, receipt number 07520000000003311566 20 is granted (David W. Grace). Mailed notice (pm, )
January 23, 2009 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Arlander Keys:Status hearing held; continued to 3/13/09 at 9:00 a.m. Discovery is proceeding. The Parties are reminded that fact discovery cuts off on 5/15/09. If the Parties are desirous of a settlement conference, they are to notify this Court's courtroom deputy pursuant to the discussion held in open court. (ac, )
December 2, 2008 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Arlander Keys: Minute entry #21 having been entered in error, the order is hereby stricken. (ac, )
December 1, 2008 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Arlander Keys:Status hearing held; continued to 1/23/09 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff only appeared. Discovery is proceeding. The Parties are reminded that fact discovery cuts off on 5/15/09. Counsel for Defendant to be present at the next status hearing. (ac, )
December 1, 2008 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Arlander Keys:Status hearing held; continued to 12/12/08 at 9:00 a.m. It appears that some progress was made among the Parties toward the settlement of this case. The Parties are given a few days to consider the settlement proposals. Defendants Answer to the Complaint or other pleading is stayed to 12/5/08. Defendants request to admit facts is also stayed until 12/5/08. (ac, )
November 26, 2008 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003311566. (Grace, David)
November 24, 2008 19 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Universal Music Group, Inc. (Jirgal, Thomas)
November 24, 2008 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Universal Music Group, Inc.(Jirgal, Thomas)
November 24, 2008 17 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Signature Network, Inc. (Jirgal, Thomas)
November 24, 2008 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Signature Network, Inc.(Jirgal, Thomas)
November 24, 2008 15 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Motley Crue, Inc. (Jirgal, Thomas)
November 24, 2008 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Motley Crue, Inc.(Jirgal, Thomas)
November 12, 2008 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Arlander Keys: Status hearing set for 12/1/2008 at 09:00 AM. in courtroom 2230. (ac, )
October 31, 2008 12 RETURN of copyright registration number request form by Lawrence E. Thompson. (Poor Quality Original - Paper Document on File.)(ef, ) Modified on 11/7/2008 (ef, ).
October 22, 2008 11 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Arlander Keys for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: all discovery disputes and all discovery motions.(pm, )Mailed notice.
October 22, 2008 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable David H. Coar:Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference held on 10/22/2008. All disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) shall be made on or before 12/29/2008. Any amendments to pleadings or actions to join other parties shall be filed on or before 1/6/2009. Discovery is ordered closed on 5/15/2009. The parties shall disclose expert testimony pursuant to Rule 26(a)(2) on or before 6/5/2009. The parties may depose the other side' s expert at any time prior to 6/19/2009. The parties shall disclose any rebuttal expert pursuant to Rule 26(a)(2)( c) at any time prior to 7/32009. The parties may depose the opposing party's rebuttal expert by 7/17/2009. Discovery materials are not to be filed with the Court pursuant to N.D. Ill. Local Rule 26.3 (discovery "shall not be filed with the court"). All discovery disputes and all discovery motions are referred to the Magistrate Judge. Dispositive motions with supporting memoranda due by 6/15/2009 (all motions are to be filed in accordance to and noticed for presentment for a date certain pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(b)).Final Pretrial Order due by 9/30/2009. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2009 at 10:30 AM. Jury Trial set for 10/19/2009 at 10:00 AM. This schedule will not be altered/amended.The parties are directed to review this Court's standing orders. Copies are available in chambers or through the Court's web page. Mailed notice (pm, )
October 21, 2008 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Motley Crue, Inc. by Thomas P. Jirgal (Jirgal, Thomas)
October 15, 2008 8 PROPOSED Pretrial Order 16(b) Scheduling Order (Thompson, Lawrence)
October 15, 2008 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Thompson, Lawrence)
September 11, 2008 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable David H. Coar: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference is set for October 22, 2008 at 9:00 a.m. Report of Parties' Planning Conference pursuant to Rule 26(f) and the Proposed Scheduling Order pursuant to Rule 16(b) to be e-filed (see paragraph "B" below). Both documents to be e-filed on the docket as individual separate documents. Forms of Report of Planning conference and Proposed Scheduling Order are available on the Court's web page or in chambers. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice (aac, )
June 30, 2008 5 LETTER from Lawrence E. Thompson dated 6/26/2008. (Exhibits). (ef, )
June 18, 2008 MAILED Copyright Request Letter to Plaintiff's counsel. (ef, )
June 17, 2008 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ron Toma by Lawrence E Thompson. (ef, )
June 17, 2008 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ef, )
June 17, 2008 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ron Toma; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A).(ef, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toma v. Motley Crue, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Toma
Represented By: Lawrence E Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motley Crue, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signature Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?