George et al v. Kraft Foods Global, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Gerald George, Cathy Dunn, Timothy Streff and Andrew Swanson
Defendant: Kraft Foods Global, Inc., Kraft Foods Global Inc. Administrative Committee, Benefits Investment Committee, Jim Dollive, Karen May, Marc Firestone, Pamela King, Timothy McLevish, Kraft Foods, Inc., Kraft Foods Global, Inc. Management Committee of Employee Benefits, Compensation and Governance Committee of the Kraft Foods, Inc. Board of Directors, Kraft Benefits Investment Group, Corporate Employee Plans Investment Committee of the Board of Directors of Altria Group, Inc., Altria Corporate Services, Inc. and Benefits Investment Group of Altria Corporate Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv03799
Filed: July 2, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 29, 2012 335 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and Order, Signed by the Honorable Nan R. Nolan on 2/29/2012.(ea, )
October 25, 2011 291 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order, Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 10/25/2011.(ea, )
July 25, 2011 261 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order, Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 7/25/2011.(ea, )
July 19, 2011 257 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order, Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 7/19/2011.(ea, )
December 17, 2009 130 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/17/2009.(ef, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George et al v. Kraft Foods Global, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald George
Represented By: Nelson G. Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Dunn
Represented By: Nelson G. Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Streff
Represented By: Nelson G. Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Swanson
Represented By: Nelson G. Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Foods Global, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda A Sonneborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Foods Global Inc. Administrative Committee
Represented By: Amanda A Sonneborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benefits Investment Committee
Represented By: Amanda A Sonneborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Dollive
Represented By: Amanda A Sonneborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen May
Represented By: Amanda A Sonneborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Firestone
Represented By: Amanda A Sonneborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela King
Represented By: Amanda A Sonneborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy McLevish
Represented By: Amanda A Sonneborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda A Sonneborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Foods Global, Inc. Management Committee of Employee Benefits
Represented By: Amanda A Sonneborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compensation and Governance Committee of the Kraft Foods, Inc. Board of Directors
Represented By: Amanda A Sonneborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Benefits Investment Group
Represented By: Amanda A Sonneborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporate Employee Plans Investment Committee of the Board of Directors of Altria Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Corporate Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benefits Investment Group of Altria Corporate Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?