Mintel International Group, LTD. v. Neergheen

Plaintiff: Mintel International Group, LTD.
Defendant: Meesham Neergheen
Case Number: 1:2008cv03939
Filed: July 11, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Referring Judge: Maria Valdez
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2010 251 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 1/12/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )
April 17, 2009 243 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 4/17/2009.Mailed notice(tbk, )
February 3, 2009 219 Opinion or Order of the Court Entered MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 2/3/2009. Mailed notice(yp, )
December 16, 2008 170 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 12/16/2008.Mailed notice(tbk, )
November 17, 2008 151 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 11/17/2008.Mailed notice(yp, )
September 3, 2008 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/3/2008:Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mintel International Group, LTD. v. Neergheen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mintel International Group, LTD.
Represented By: Victor J. Pioli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meesham Neergheen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?