Baugh v. Cuprum S.A. De C.V. et al

Plaintiff: John Baugh
Defendant: Cuprum S.A. De C.V., Louisville Ladder, Inc., Verzatec, S.A.B. de C.V. and Imsatec, S.A.B. de C.V.
Case Number: 1:2008cv04204
Filed: July 24, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: David H. Coar
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2015 422 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/22/15Mailed notice(ca, ).
March 27, 2012 310 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/27/2012: Mailed notice(etv, )
January 12, 2010 128 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable David H. Coar on 1/12/2010(ca, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baugh v. Cuprum S.A. De C.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Baugh
Represented By: Junie L. Sinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuprum S.A. De C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisville Ladder, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verzatec, S.A.B. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imsatec, S.A.B. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?