Baig et al v. The Coca-Cola Company

Plaintiff: Mirza N Baig and Blue Springs Water Co.
Defendant: The Coca-Cola Company
Case Number: 1:2008cv04206
Filed: July 24, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Trademark Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2014 195 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/24/14Mailed notice(ca, ).
July 28, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/28/2009.(vmj, )
May 27, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/27/2009: Mailed notice (gds, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baig et al v. The Coca-Cola Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirza N Baig
Represented By: David J. Kiesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Springs Water Co.
Represented By: David J. Kiesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Coca-Cola Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?