Morris v. Illionis Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Derrick Morris
Defendant: Illionis Department of Corrections and Roger Walker, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2008cv04518
Filed: August 9, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Will
Presiding Judge: Charles P. Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2012 144 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 10/11/2012: All pending motions are denied. (For further details see minute order.)Mailed notice(sct, )
February 6, 2012 128 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 2/6/2012.Mailed notice(sct, )
June 21, 2011 107 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 6/21/2011.Mailed notice(sct, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Illionis Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Morris
Represented By: Peter Alexander Papoutsis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illionis Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Walker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?