JIT Packaging Inc v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff JIT Packaging Inc. alleged that Defendant Google, Inc. concealed the fact that many of its AdWords advertisements appeared on low quality parked/non-content sites and error pages.

Plaintiff: JIT Packaging Inc
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv04543
Filed: August 11, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2008 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Pursuant to Stipulation 27 the parties consent and stipulate to the voluntary dismissal, without prejudice, of Plaintiff's entire complaint. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 22 is stricken as moot. Status hearing date of 10/9/08 is stricken. Notice of Motion date of 10/9/08 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (tbk, )
October 8, 2008 27 STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (Foote, Robert)
October 2, 2008 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr:Motion of Leo P. Nortonb for leave to appear pro hac vice 16 on behalf of defendant is granted. Motion of Peter J. Willsey for leave to appear pro hac vice 17 on behalf of defendant is granted. Motion of Michael G. Rhodes for leave to to appear pro hac vice 25 on behalf of defendant is granted.Mailed notice (smm)
October 1, 2008 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003154419. (Rhodes, Michael)
September 30, 2008 24 NOTICE of Motion by Henry M. Baskerville for presentment of motion to dismiss 22 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 10/9/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Baskerville, Henry)
September 30, 2008 23 MEMORANDUM by Google, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss 22 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Baskerville, Henry)
September 30, 2008 22 MOTION by Defendant Google, Inc. to dismiss Under Rule 12(B)(3) or Alternatively Motion to Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(A), and Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(B)(6) (Baskerville, Henry)
September 30, 2008 21 Notice of Pendency of Other Actions by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Baskerville, Henry)
September 30, 2008 20 Notice of Designation of Local Counsel Pursuant to LR 83.15 by Google, Inc. (Baskerville, Henry)
September 30, 2008 19 Corporate Disclosure Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Google, Inc. (Baskerville, Henry)
September 30, 2008 18 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Google, Inc. (Baskerville, Henry)
September 30, 2008 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003151669. (Willsey, Peter)
September 30, 2008 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003151627. (Norton, Leo)
September 16, 2008 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Defendant Google, Inc. for extension of time 13 to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint is granted to and including 9/30/08. Notice of Motion date of 9/18/08 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date.Mailed notice (tbk, )
September 10, 2008 14 NOTICE of Motion by Henry M. Baskerville for presentment of extension of time 13 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 9/18/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Baskerville, Henry)
September 10, 2008 13 MOTION by Defendant Google, Inc. for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint (Baskerville, Henry)
September 10, 2008 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google, Inc. by Jonathan M. Cyrluk (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
September 10, 2008 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google, Inc. by Henry M. Baskerville (Baskerville, Henry)
September 2, 2008 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing set for 10/9/2008 at 09:00 AM. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Parties to prepare and submit a joint status report within two days prior to status. (See Judges web page for status report)Mailed notice (tbk, )
August 25, 2008 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JIT Packaging Inc as to Google, Inc. on 8/21/2008, answer due 9/10/2008. (Foote, Robert)
August 11, 2008 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Google, Inc. (hp, )
August 11, 2008 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff JIT Packaging Inc by Peter Lawrence Currie (hp, )
August 11, 2008 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff JIT Packaging Inc by Mark Anthony Bulgarelli (hp, )
August 11, 2008 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff JIT Packaging Inc by Matthew J. Herman (hp, )
August 11, 2008 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff JIT Packaging Inc by Robert M. Foote (hp, )
August 11, 2008 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (hp, )
August 11, 2008 1 COMPLAINT - Class Action filed by JIT Packaging Inc. (Exhibits); Jury Demand. Filing fee $350.(hp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JIT Packaging Inc v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIT Packaging Inc
Represented By: Matthew J. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?