Rodriguez v. City of Chicago

Plaintiff: Teresa Rodriguez
Defendant: City of Chicago
Case Number: 1:2008cv04710
Filed: August 19, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Joan H. Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2013 240 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 9/24/2013: Rodriguez's petition for attorneys' fees [dkt. 222] is granted in part and denied in part. The court awards Rodriguez attorneys' fees in the amount of $217,053.00 and costs and expenses in the amount of $7,011.64, for a total fee award of $224,064.64.Mailed notice(mad, )
February 29, 2012 218 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 2/29/2012: Plaintiff's motion to enforce settlement agreement [#212] is denied. In-court ruling date of 3/1/2012 stricken.Mailed notice(mad, )
March 25, 2011 198 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 3/25/2011:Mailed notice(mad, )
August 5, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Nan R. Nolan on 8/5/2009.Mailed notice(lxs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Rodriguez
Represented By: Margaret Megan O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?