Morales-Placencia v. City Of Chicago et al

Plaintiff: Juan Ramon Morales-Placencia
Defendant: City Of Chicago, Jerome Finnigan and Frank Villareal
Case Number: 1:2008cv05365
Filed: September 18, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 4/21/2011.Mailed notice(sct, )
February 18, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 2/18/2011: Plaintiff's motion (Doc 52 ) to reinstate Count V against Finnigan is granted. Plaintiff's motion (Doc 55 ) to amend is also granted. Defendants Villareal and Finnig an's motions (Docs 56 and 57 ) to dismiss are entered and continued. Morales-Placencia has until 2/25/2011 to submit his amended complaint. Failure to file his amended complaint by that time will result in the dismissal of his case with prejudice. Ruling set for 2/24/2011 is stricken as moot. Status hearing set for 3/9/2011 at 9:30 a.m. (For further details see minute order.)Mailed notice(sct, )
October 20, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 10/20/2010.Mailed notice(sct, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales-Placencia v. City Of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Ramon Morales-Placencia
Represented By: David Alberto Cerda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Finnigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Villareal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?