Supreme Auto Transport LLC v. Arcelor Mittal et al
Plaintiff: Supreme Auto Transport LLC
Defendant: Arcelor Mittal USA, Inc., SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation, Commercial Metals, Inc., Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation, AK Steel Holding Corporation, United States Steel Corporation, Steel Dynamics, Inc., Nucor Corporation and Arcelor Mittal
Case Number: 1:2008cv05468
Filed: September 24, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Anti-Trust Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 CERTIFIED COPY OF OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Argued 2/16/2018; Decided 9/6/2018 in USCA case no. 17-2910. (kp, )
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 251 CERTIFIED COPY OF USCA JUDGMENT dated 9/6/2018 regarding notice of appeal #220 ; USCA No. 17-2910 ; The judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED, with costs, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (kp, )
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MANDATE of USCA dated 9/28/2018 regarding notice of appeal #220 ;USCA No.17-2910 ; No record to be returned. (kp, )
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Plaintiffs' objections to defendants' bills of costs are overruled in part, sustained in part. The bills do not unreasonably seek costs associated with the related case brought by direct purchasers. The bills cover transcripts obtained as a part of this case (occurring after the settlement of the related case, and therefore attributable to this case). The court allows defendants to seek 100% of the post-settlement deposition costs, but to the extent some defendants only seek 50%, the discount is accepted. The bills seek to tax the exemplification of discovery items that were necessarily produced to the indirect purchaser plaintiffs in this case. That the indirect purchasers did not use the discovery in their amended complaint is not a basis to refuse to tax the costs. The discovery was produced to them and they had the opportunity to review it. The indirect purchasers chose to accept the discovery. Defendants have reasonably apportioned the costs of that discovery to avoid taxing the indirect purchasers for the costs of production to the direct purchasers. The plaintiffs argue that the costs of OCR and e-discovery processing are not taxable, but absent some showing that the plaintiffs did not want OCR or did not benefit from the processing, in cases of this complexity such e-discovery is a reasonable step of exemplification. The objections to taxing the costs of video recording depositions are overruled. At the time of the depositions, it was reasonably necessary to preserve the testimony in an effective format. The costs associated with deposition exhibits are disallowed, because they were incurred for convenience. Even in a large-volume document case, exhibits that exist in discovery need not be duplicated by deposition court reporters. Defendants made no showing that authentication through the deposition copy of an exhibit was necessary here. The costs for a rough draft deposition transcript, real time, and "litigation packages" are disallowed as without adequate justification. Rough drafts and real time can be taxable, but here, the necessary urgency was absent. The court declines to stay ruling on the bills of costs, but does stay the execution or enforcement of this award until the conclusion of appellate proceedings. If the judgment is affirmed, this award will be effective upon the issuance of the mandate from the court of appeals. Plaintiffs are taxed as follows: ArcelorMittal is awarded $9,339.46; Commerical Metals is awarded $3,582.95; U.S. Steel is awarded $32,207.55; SSAB Swedish Steel is awarded $3,035.99; Gerdau Ameristeel is awarded $14,314.40; Steel Dynamics is awarded $3,845.53; and NuCor is awarded $58,324.89. Notices mailed. (psm, )
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 USCA RECEIVED on 1/11/18 the long record regarding notice of appeal #220 . (smm)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 247 CERTIFIED and transmitted to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal #220 (USCA no. 17-2910). (smm)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE to Transmit Record on Appeal regarding notice of appeal #220 ; USCA Case No. 17-2910 (ew, )
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 245 RESPONSE by Defendants Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation, Nucor Corporation, SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation, Steel Dynamics, Inc. to objections #241 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ehlman, Todd)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 244 RESPONSE by Defendant Arcelor Mittal USA, Inc. to objections #241 (The Arcelormittal Defendants' Response to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Submitted Bills of Costs) (Marovitz, Andrew)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 243 RESPONSE by Defendant United States Steel Corporation to objections #241 (Mantine, Michelle)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 242 RESPONSE by Defendant Commercial Metals, Inc. to objections #241 (Liu, Angela)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 241 OBJECTIONS To Defendants' Submitted Bills of Costs (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Lovell, Christopher)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The minute entry dated 10/2/17 is amended to include that defendants' motion to include certain items in the record on appeal #237 is also granted. Notices mailed. (psm, )
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to supplement the record on appeal #235 is granted. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Include Certain Items in the Record on Appeal Pursuant to Circuit Rule 10(a) #237 NOTICE of Motion by Todd Jay Ehlman for presentment of before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 10/4/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Ehlman, Todd)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Defendants' Motion to Include Certain Items in the Record on Appeal Pursuant to Circuit Rule 10(a) by Nucor Corporation (Joint) (Ehlman, Todd)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE of Motion by Christopher Lovell for presentment of motion to supplement #235 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 10/4/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Lovell, Christopher)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MOTION by Plaintiff Supreme Auto Transport LLC to supplement The Record On Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript, #2 Exhibit Transcript)(Lovell, Christopher)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 234 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Supreme Auto Transport LLC (Lovell, Christopher)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 DOCKETING Statement by Supreme Auto Transport LLC regarding notice of appeal #220 (Lovell, Christopher)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Objections to bills of costs are due 10/10/17. Responses to objections are due 10/24/17. The court will issue a ruling on the bills of costs via cm/ecf. Notices mailed. (psm, )
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 231 BILL of Costs (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Ehlman, Todd)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MOTION by Defendant Steel Dynamics, Inc. for bill of costs (O'Connor, Katharine) Modified on 9/19/2017 (aee, ).
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 229 BILL of Costs for Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation (Birk, Daniel)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 BILL of Costs (Treece, John)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 227 BILL of Costs for United States Steel Corporation (Mantine, Michelle)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 226 BILL of Costs for ArceloMittal S.A. and ArcelorMittal USA LLC (Marovitz, Andrew)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #220 ; USCA Case No. 17-2910 (mma, )
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #220 . Notified counsel (gcy, )
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 BILL of Costs For Commercial Metal Company (Levin, Christine)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 222 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #220 . (gcy, )
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 DOCKETING Statement by Supreme Auto Transport LLC regarding notice of appeal #220 (Lovell, Christopher)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 NOTICE of appeal by Supreme Auto Transport LLC regarding orders #218 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-13582839. (Lovell, Christopher)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 08/17/17 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway, 312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2017. (Conway, Colleen)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. Motion hearing held. Preliminary approval hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, the Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Steel Dynamics, Inc. #13 is denied. On the court's own motion, the court's ruling on the motions to dismiss and the motion to reconsider are expanded to apply to defendant Steel Dynamics. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed as to Steel Dynamics. Enter final judgment. Civil case terminated. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 216 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 07/14/17 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway @312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2017. (Conway, Colleen)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 NOTICE of Motion by Marvin Alan Miller for presentment of motion for settlement #213 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 8/17/2017 at 10:30 AM. (Miller, Marvin)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MEMORANDUM by Supreme Auto Transport LLC in support of motion for settlement #213 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Steel Dynamics, Inc., Conditional Certification of a Settlement Class, and Order for Timing of Dissemination of Notice (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement and Certifying Settlement Class)(Miller, Marvin)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MOTION by Plaintiff Supreme Auto Transport LLC for settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Steel Dynamics, Inc. (Miller, Marvin)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. Final judgment will not be entered at this time, based on plaintiffs' request to file a motion for preliminary approval of settlement with defendant SDI. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary approval is due 8/15/17. Plaintiff may notice the motion for presentment on 8/17/17 at 10:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, )
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 7/13/2017: Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration #207 is denied. [For further detail see attached order.] Notices mailed. (psm, )
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 REPLY by Supreme Auto Transport LLC to response in opposition to motion, #209 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Craig Essenmacher)(Essenmacher, Craig)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 RESPONSE by AK Steel Holding Corporation, Arcelor Mittal, Arcelor Mittal USA, Inc., Commercial Metals, Inc., Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation, Nucor Corporation, SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation, United States Steel Corporationin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Supreme Auto Transport LLC for reconsideration regarding status hearing,, set deadlines,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings, #205 #207 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ehlman, Todd)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 02/16/17 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway, 312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2017. (Conway, Colleen)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MOTION by Plaintiff Supreme Auto Transport LLC for reconsideration regarding status hearing,, set deadlines,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings, #205 (Lovell, Christopher)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 03/14/17 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway, 312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/28/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2017. (Conway, Colleen)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to reconsider is due 4/4/17. Defendants' response is due 5/2/17; plaintiff's reply 5/16/17. Continued status hearing is set for 7/14/17 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, )
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 3/3/2017: defendants' motion to dismiss #175 is granted. [For further detail see attached order.] Status hearing is set for 3/14/2017 at 09:30 a.m. Notices mailed.(psm, )
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. Plaintiff and Steel Dynamics report they have reached a settlement, and the request for a stay as to Steel Dynamics is granted. All proceedings concerning defendant Steel Dynamics are stayed. The court will issue a ruling on the motion to dismiss #175 via cm/ecf in which any further dates will be set. The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #200 is granted. Notices mailed. (psm, )
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 STATUS Report (The Parties' Joint Status Report in Advance of the Court's February 16, 2017 Status Conference) by Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class and by Arcelor Mittal USA, Inc., Commercial Metals, Inc., Nucor Corporation, United States Steel Corporation, SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation, Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation, and AK Steel Holding Corporation (Marovitz, Andrew) Modified on 2/15/2017 (mmy, )
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AK Steel Holding Corporation by Kevin J. Mahoney (Mahoney, Kevin)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12852358. (Murray, Heather)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The minute entry dated 1/10/17 is amended to read that a status hearing is set for 2/16/17 at 12:30 p.m. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, )
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Final approval hearing is set for 2/16/17 at 12:30 p.m. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, )
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 STIPULATION and Order (O'Connor, Katharine)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 196 NOTICE of Correction #194 (mr, )
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 195 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Hon. James B. Zagel took senior status effective October 21, 2016 pursuant to 28 USC 294(b); and It further appearing that 08 CV 5214, Standard Iron Works v. Arcelormittal et al; 08 CV 5371, Wilmington Steel Processing Co, Inc. v. Arcelormittal et al; 08 CV 5633 Capow, Inc. v. Arcelormittal et al; 08 CV 5468 Supreme Auto Transport LLC v. Arcelor Mittal et al; 08 CV 6197 Alco Industries, Inc. v. Arcelormittal et al; and 10 CV 4236 Gulf Stream Builders Supply, Inc. v. Arcelormittal et al are related cases currently assigned to the Hon. James B. Zagel; and It further appearing that Judge Zagel has requested that these related cases be reassigned to another judge of this Court pursuant to 28 USC 294(b); therefore It is hereby ordered that 08 CV 5214, Standard Iron Works v. Arcelormittal et al; 08 CV 5371, Wilmington Steel Processing Co, Inc. v. Arcelormittal et al; 08 CV 5633 Capow, Inc. v. Arcelormittal et al; 08 CV 5468 Supreme Auto Transport LLC v. Arcelor Mittal et al; 08 CV 6197 Alco Industries, Inc. v. Arcelormittal et al; and 10 CV 4236 Gulf Stream Builders Supply, Inc. v. Arcelormittal et al are related cases to be reassigned to Judge Manish S. Shah by agreement, pursuant to IOP 13(c)(4). Case reassigned to the Honorable Manish S. Shah for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/28/2016.(mr, )
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 194 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Hon. James B. Zagel took senior status effective October 21, 2016 pursuant to 28 USC 294(b); and It further appearing that 08 CV 5214, Standard Iron Works v. Arcelormittal et al; 08 CV 5371, Wilmington Steel Processing Co, Inc. v. Arcelormittal et al; 08 CV 5633 Capow, Inc. v. Arcelormittal et al; 08 CV 5468 Supreme Auto Transport LLC v. Arcelor Mittal et al; 08 CV 6197 Alco Industries, Inc. v. Arcelormittal et al; and 10 CV 4263 Gulf Stream Builders Supply, Inc. v. Arcelormittal et al are related cases currently assigned to the Hon. James B. Zagel; and It further appearing that Judge Zagel has requested that these related cases be reassigned to another judge of this Court pursuant to 28 USC 294(b); therefore It is hereby ordered that 08 CV 5214, Standard Iron Works v. Arcelormittal et al; 08 CV 5371, Wilmington Steel Processing Co, Inc. v. Arcelormittal et al; 08 CV 5633 Capow, Inc. v. Arcelormittal et al; 08 CV 5468 Supreme Auto Transport LLC v. Arcelor Mittal et al; 08 CV 6197 Alco Industries, Inc. v. Arcelormittal et al; and 10 CV 4263 Gulf Stream Builders Supply, Inc. v. Arcelormittal et al are related cases to be reassigned to Judge Manish S. Shah by agreement, pursuant to IOP 13(c)(4). Case reassigned to the Honorable Manish S. Shah for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/28/2016.(mr, )
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order On 11/22/016 the Clerk audited this case file and discovered that John W. Treece is not receiving electronic notice. The Clerk modified CM/ECF to provide notice to the attorney. The record indicates you are counsel of record in this case. If you are no longer representing this client, you must file a Motion to withdraw from this case pursuant to LR 83.17 (gcy, )
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Ruling previously set for 9/20/16 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Ruling to issue via the CM/ECF system. Mailed notice (ep, )
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 REPLY in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. (ep, )
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Defendants' Motion for Leave to File, Instanter, a Brief in Excess of the Page Limitation #189 is granted. Hearing set for 8/30/16 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (ep, )
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 190 NOTICE of Motion by Joel Gerald Chefitz for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, #189 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 8/30/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Chefitz, Joel)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MOTION by Defendants AK Steel Holding Corporation, Arcelor Mittal, Arcelor Mittal USA, Inc., Commercial Metals, Inc., Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation, Nucor Corporation, SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation, Steel Dynamics, Inc., United States Steel Corporation for leave to file excess pages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chefitz, Joel)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 RESPONSE by Supreme Auto Transport LLCin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #175 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint (Miller, Marvin)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Brief in Excess of the Page Limitation #185 is granted. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a 45 page response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Hearing set for 7/21/16 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (ep, )
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Szot for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #185 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 7/21/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Szot, Andrew)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MOTION by Plaintiff Supreme Auto Transport LLC for leave to file excess pages Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Page Limitation (Szot, Andrew)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER Authorizing Access to Sealed Submissions in Related Case. Signed by the Honorable James B. Zagel on 6/30/2016. mailed notice(rm, )
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Motion hearing held. Plaintiffs Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Authorizing Access to Sealed Submissions in Related Case #179 is granted. Order entered. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation by Jacob Michael Hamann (Hamann, Jacob)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 181 [CORRECTED] NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Szot for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #179 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 6/30/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Szot, Andrew)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Szot for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #179 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 6/30/2016 at 09:30 PM. (Szot, Andrew)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MOTION by Plaintiff Supreme Auto Transport LLCOrder Authorizing Access To Sealed Documents (Szot, Andrew)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Per minute entry dated 5/11/2016, docket no. #155 a briefing schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint #175 was set as follows: Response due 7/25/2016; Reply due 8/22/2016. Ruling on motion set for 9/20/2016 at 9:30 a.m. Defendants' Motion for Leave to File, Instanter, Brief in Excess of Page Limitation #176 is granted. Hearing set for 6/16/2016 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
June 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE of Motion by Joel Gerald Chefitz for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, #176 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #175 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 6/16/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Chefitz, Joel)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MOTION by Defendants AK Steel Holding Corporation, Arcelor Mittal, Arcelor Mittal USA, Inc., Commercial Metals, Inc., Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation, Nucor Corporation, SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation, Steel Dynamics, Inc., United States Steel Corporation for leave to file excess pages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chefitz, Joel)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Chefitz, Joel)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MAIL RETURNED, for document #159 , #160 sent to Craig Essenmacher returned as undeliverable, return to sender. Pro Hac Vice application was filed on 10/29/2015 #125 . Re-mailed to 61 Broadway, New York, NY 10006 (Attachments: #1 Returned Mail Doc #160 ) (sr, )
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Motions to Withdraw as Attorney #166 , #169 , #171 are granted. Attorney David John Stanoch, Susan M Lorenc and Todd A. Rowden withdrawn. Motion hearing set for 6/9/16 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (ao,)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE of Motion by Todd A. Rowden for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #171 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 6/14/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Rowden, Todd)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MOTION by Attorney Todd A. Rowden to withdraw as attorney for Commercial Metals, Inc.. New address information: party has settled (Rowden, Todd)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE of Motion by Susan M Lorenc for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #169 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 6/14/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Lorenc, Susan)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MOTION by Attorney Susan Lorenc to withdraw as attorney for Commercial Metals, Inc.. New address information: party has settled (Lorenc, Susan)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #161 , and #163 are granted. Mailed notice (ao,)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 167 NOTICE of Motion by Angela M. Liu for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #166 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 6/9/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Liu, Angela)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MOTION by Attorney David Stanoch to withdraw as attorney for Commercial Metals, Inc.. No party information provided (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Liu, Angela)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Commercial Metals, Inc. by Angela M. Liu (Liu, Angela)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 164 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #162 , #163 sent to Attorney David John Stanoch returned as: Unknown Address Error. Mailed to attorney David John Stanoch a with Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11985977. (Derise, Robert)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 162 REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of $50, receipt no. 0752-11981699, regarding motion to appear pro hac vice #161 (Watts, Ryan)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0752-11981699. (Watts, Ryan)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 AMENDED PROTECTIVE Order. Signed by the Honorable James B. Zagel on 5/25/2016. Mailed notice(rm, )
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Plaintiff's agreed motion for entry of an amended protective order #157 is granted. Motion hearing set for 5/31/16 is stricken. Enter Amended Protective Order. Mailed notice (ao,)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Szot for presentment of motion for protective order #157 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 5/31/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Szot, Andrew)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MOTION by Plaintiff Supreme Auto Transport LLC for protective order Agreed Motion for Entry of an Amended Protective Order (Szot, Andrew)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER Signed by the Honorable James B. Zagel on 5/11/2016. Mailed notice (ao,)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Defendant's agreed motion to set a briefing schedule for motion to dismiss amended complaint #153 is granted. Defendants' shall file motion to dismiss by 6/10/16; Response due 7/25/16; Reply due 8/22/16. Status hearing set for 6/28/16 is stricken. Ruling on motion set for 9/20/16 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ao,)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE of Motion by Chelsea L Black for presentment of motion by filer to set a briefing schedule, #153 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 5/17/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Black, Chelsea)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION by Defendants AK Steel Holding Corporation, Arcelor Mittal, Arcelor Mittal USA, Inc., Commercial Metals, Inc., Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation, Nucor Corporation, SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation, Steel Dynamics, Inc., United States Steel Corporation to set a briefing schedule (Agreed) (Black, Chelsea)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 AMENDED complaint by Supreme Auto Transport LLC against AK Steel Holding Corporation, Arcelor Mittal, Arcelor Mittal USA, Inc., Commercial Metals, Inc., Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation, Nucor Corporation, SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation, Steel Dynamics, Inc., United States Steel Corporation (Miller, Marvin)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Supreme Auto Transport LLC by Keith Essenmacher (Essenmacher, Keith)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #149 is granted. Attorney Keith Essenmacher is granted leave to appear on behalf of Plaintiff. Mailed notice (ep, )
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11790610. (Essenmacher, Keith)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Supreme Auto Transport LLC by Andrew Szot (Szot, Andrew)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Supreme Auto Transport LLC by Merrick Scott Rayle (Rayle, Merrick)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Supreme Auto Transport LLC by Craig Essenmacher (Essenmacher, Craig)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Motion hearing held. The parties reported that an agreement has been reached with respect to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #141 : Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before 4/26/16. The parties will meet and confer regarding a subsequent motion to dismiss. Further status hearing set for 6/28/16 at 9:15 a.m. Class certification briefing is held in abeyance at this time. Mailed notice (ep, )
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Steel Dynamics, Inc. by David L Hanselman, Jr (Hanselman, David)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE of Motion by Joel Gerald Chefitz for presentment of motion to dismiss, #141 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 3/29/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Chefitz, Joel)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM by AK Steel Holding Corporation, Arcelor Mittal, Arcelor Mittal USA, Inc., Commercial Metals, Inc., Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation, Nucor Corporation, SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation, Steel Dynamics, Inc., United States Steel Corporation in support of motion to dismiss, #141 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Chefitz, Joel)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MOTION by Defendants Arcelor Mittal USA, Inc., AK Steel Holding Corporation, United States Steel Corporation, Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation, SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation, Nucor Corporation, Commercial Metals, Inc., Steel Dynamics, Inc., Arcelor Mittal to dismiss (Chefitz, Joel)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Steel Dynamics, Inc. by Katharine Maureen O'Connor (O'Connor, Katharine)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Steel Dynamics, Inc. by Chelsea L Black (Black, Chelsea)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Defendant's Motion to Withdraw #136 is granted. Attorney Max A. Stein is granted leave to withdraw his appearance on behalf of Defendant. Hearing set for 3/15/16 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (ep, )
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE of Motion by Max A Stein for presentment of motion to withdraw #136 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 3/15/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Stein, Max)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION by Defendant United States Steel Corporation to withdraw appearance (Stein, Max)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #134 is granted. Attorney Daniel I. Booker is granted leave to appear on behalf of Defendant United States Steel Corporation. Mailed notice (ep, )
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11654406. (Booker, Daniel)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( #131 ) is GRANTED. Mailed notice (ao,)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Steel Dynamics, Inc. by Michelle S. Lowery (Lowery, Michelle)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11361699. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Levin, Christine)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER. Signed by the Honorable James B. Zagel on 11/18/2015. Mailed notice(ep, )
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #125 is granted. Attorney Craig M. Essenmacher is granted leave to appear on behalf of Plaintiff. The parties' Agreed Motion Regarding Indirect Class Certification Scheduling In Compliance with the Court's Order of 10/30/15 #127 is granted. Enter Order. Hearing set for 11/19/15 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (ep, )
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Stanley Marovitz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #127 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 11/19/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Marovitz, Andrew)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION by Defendants AK Steel Holding Corporation, Arcelor Mittal, Arcelor Mittal USA, Inc., Commercial Metals, Inc., Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation, Nucor Corporation, SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation, Steel Dynamics, Inc., United States Steel Corporation Regarding Indirect Class Certification Scheduling in Compliance with The Court's October 30, 2015 Order (Motion of Plaintiff Supreme Auto Transport LLC and Defendants) (Agreed) (Marovitz, Andrew)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER. Signed by the Honorable James B. Zagel on 10/30/2015. Mailed notice(ep, )
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11242560. (Essenmacher, Craig)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Motion hearing held. Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Set a Briefing Schedule #118 is granted. Plaintiff and Defendants' Agreed Motion Regarding Indirect Scheduling Following Certain Defendants' Rule 23(F) Motion #123 is granted. The parties shall meet and confer and submit an agreed schedule. Defendant's Motion to Withdraw #121 is granted. Attorney Clair Marguerite Korenblit is granted leave to withdraw he appearance on behalf of Defendant SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation. Hearing set for 10/22/15 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (ep, )
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MOTION by Defendants AK Steel Holding Corporation, Arcelor Mittal USA, Inc., Commercial Metals, Inc., Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation, Nucor Corporation, SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation, Steel Dynamics, Inc., United States Steel Corporation Regarding Indirect Scheduling Following Certain Defendants' Rule 23(F) Motion (Agreed) and by Plantiff Supreme Auto Transport LLC #119 (Marovitz, Andrew)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE of Motion by Scott David Stein for presentment of motion to withdraw #121 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 10/22/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Stein, Scott)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION by Defendant SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation to withdraw Appearance of Clair Marguerite Korenblit (Stein, Scott)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #119 , #118 sent to Attorney Claire Marguerite Korenblit returned as: Unknown Address Error. Mailed to attorney Claire Marguerite Korenblit Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ea, )
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE of Motion by Marvin Alan Miller for presentment of motion by filer to set a briefing schedule #118 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 10/20/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Miller, Marvin)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION by Plaintiff Supreme Auto Transport LLC to set a briefing schedule INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION ON SCHEDULE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Miller, Marvin)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Counsel's Motion to Withdraw #115 is granted. Attorney Floyd Babbitt is granted leave to withdraw his appearance on behalf of Defendant Commercial Metals, Inc. Hearing set for 6/18/15 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (ep, )
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTICE of Motion by Susan M Lorenc for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #115 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 6/18/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Lorenc, Susan)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Commercial Metals, Inc. to withdraw as attorney Floyd Babbitt's Withdrawal as Counsel (Lorenc, Susan)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Motion to Withdraw as Counsel #112 is granted. Attorneys Douglas R. Gunson and Donna E. Patterson are granted leave to withdraw their appearances on behalf of Defendant Nucor. Hearing set for 6/11/15 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (ep, )
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE of Motion by Todd Jay Ehlman for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #112 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 6/11/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Ehlman, Todd)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Nucor Corporation to withdraw as attorney (Ehlman, Todd)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MINUTE entry before Honorable James B. Zagel: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #109 is granted. Mailed notice (ep, )
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE by Jonathan Stuart Quinn of Change of Address (Quinn, Jonathan)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7733189. (Berger, Randall)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MINUTE entry before Honorable James B. Zagel:Motion to withdraw as attorney #105 is granted. The appearance of attorney Jonathan Lawrence Lewis is withdrawn. Notice of motion hearing is stricken.Mailed notice (drw, )
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Commercial Metals, Inc. by Susan M Lorenc (Lorenc, Susan)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Stanley Marovitz for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #105 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 7/18/2012 at 03:00 PM. (Marovitz, Andrew)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Arcelor Mittal USA, Inc. to withdraw as attorney re: Jonathan L. Lewis (Marovitz, Andrew)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MINUTE entry before Honorable James B. Zagel:Motion for a finding of relatedness and request to reassign case 12 Cv 2320 currently pending before Judge Ronald Guzman #102 is granted. Notice of motion hearing 4/19/2012 is stricken.Mailed notice (drw, )
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Stanley Marovitz for presentment of motion to reassign case, #102 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 4/19/2012 at 10:15 AM. (Marovitz, Andrew)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION by Defendants AK Steel Holding Corporation, Arcelor Mittal, Arcelor Mittal USA, Inc., Commercial Metals, Inc., Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation, Nucor Corporation, SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation, Steel Dynamics, Inc., United States Steel Corporation, Plaintiff Supreme Auto Transport LLC to reassign case (Joint, Agreed Motion for Reassignment Based Upon Relatedness Pursuant to Local Rule 40.4) (Marovitz, Andrew)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Arcelor Mittal USA, Inc. by Kristin Weber Silverman (Silverman, Kristin)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MINUTE entry before Honorable James B. Zagel:Motion to withdraw as attorney #99 is granted. The appearance of attorney Stephanie Lynne Poulos is withdrawn. Notice of motion hearing 2/28/2012 is stricken.Mailed notice (drw, )
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Steel Dynamics, Inc. to withdraw as attorney (Metts, Amanda)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE of Motion by Amanda Jo Metts for presentment of before Honorable James B. Zagel on 2/28/2012 at 10:15 AM. (Metts, Amanda)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Notice of Firm Name Change by Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation (Eimer, Nathan)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MINUTE entry before Honorable James B. Zagel:Motion to withdraw as attorney #94 is granted. The appearance of attorney Andrew George Klevorn is withdrawn.Mailed notice (drw, )
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Motion by Nathan P. Eimer for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #94 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 1/3/2012 at 10:15 AM. (Eimer, Nathan)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation to withdraw as attorney Andrew G. Klevorn (Eimer, Nathan)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United States Steel Corporation by Max A Stein (Stein, Max)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTE entry before Honorable James B. Zagel:Motion to certify class #88 is entered and continued. Briefing is stayed until further order of court. Notice of motion hearing 12/20/2011 is stricken.Mailed notice (drw, )
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 RESPONSE by Defendants AK Steel Holding Corporation, Arcelor Mittal, Arcelor Mittal USA, Inc., Commercial Metals, Inc., Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation, Nucor Corporation, SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation, Steel Dynamics, Inc., United States Steel Corporation to motion to certify class #88 and stay of briefing (Stein, Max)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Steel Dynamics, Inc. by Stephanie Lynne Poulos (Poulos, Stephanie)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE of Motion by Marvin Alan Miller for presentment of motion to certify class #88 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 12/20/2011 at 10:15 AM. (Miller, Marvin)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION by Plaintiff Supreme Auto Transport LLC to certify class and for Stay of Briefing (Miller, Marvin)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation by Daniel D Birk (Birk, Daniel)
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MINUTE entry before Honorable James B. Zagel:Application to appear pro hac vice #83 is granted. Motion to withdraw as attorney #84 is granted. The appearance of atorney John Kenneth Theis is withdrawn.Mailed notice (drw, )
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE of Motion by Nathan P. Eimer for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #84 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 9/27/2011 at 10:15 AM. (Eimer, Nathan)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation to withdraw as attorney John K. Theis (Eimer, Nathan)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6398549. (Wedgworth, Peggy)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE by Matthew C. Blickensderfer of Change of Address (Blickensderfer, Matthew)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AK Steel Holding Corporation by Matthew C. Blickensderfer (Blickensderfer, Matthew)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MINUTE entry before Honorable James B. Zagel:Motion for scheduling discovery #59 is granted.Mailed notice (drw, )
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE of Correction regarding #78 . (aac, )
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 FILED on the incorrect docket. (Ehlman, Todd) Modified on 3/19/2010 (aac, ).
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel:Motion for entry of a pleading and discovery order #67 is granted. Proposed order to be submitted. Noticed hearing 11/24/2009 is stricken.Mailed notice (drw, )
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE entry before Honorable James B. Zagel:Motion to withdraw as attorney #74 is granted. Attorney David Edward Morgans appearance is withdrawn.Mailed notice (drw, )
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE by Commercial Metals, Inc. re MOTION by counsel for Defendant Commercial Metals, Inc. to withdraw as attorney #74 Corrected Notice of Filing (Morgans, David)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Commercial Metals, Inc. to withdraw as attorney (Morgans, David)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE by Commercial Metals, Inc. (Morgans, David)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Commercial Metals, Inc. by Todd A. Rowden (Rowden, Todd)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Commercial Metals, Inc. by Floyd Babbitt (Babbitt, Floyd)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Commercial Metals, Inc. by Dean L. Franklin (Franklin, Dean)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Stanley Marovitz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #67 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 11/24/2009 at 10:15 AM. (Marovitz, Andrew)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Stanley Marovitz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #67 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 11/24/2009 at 10:15 AM. (Marovitz, Andrew) Modified on 11/3/2009 (aac, ). Linked document has the incorrect case number and case title.
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION by Defendants Steel Dynamics, Inc., AK Steel Holding Corporation, SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation, Commercial Metals, Inc., Arcelor Mittal, Arcelor Mittal USA, Inc., United States Steel Corporation, Nucor Corporation, Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation, Plaintiff Supreme Auto Transport LLC REGARDING INDIRECT DISCOVERY AND PLEADING (Marovitz, Andrew)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE by Daniel I. Booker of Change of Address (Booker, Daniel)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE by Joseph J. Bial of Change of Address (Bial, Joseph)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel:Application of Robert Katerberg to appear pro hac vice #60 is granted.Mailed notice (drw, )
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nucor Corporation by Robert Katerberg (Katerberg, Robert)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003972100. (Katerberg, Robert)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION by Plaintiff Supreme Auto Transport LLCIndirect Purchasers' Motion for Scheduling Discovery (Miller, Marvin)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Notice of Change of Address for Lovell Stewart Halebian LLP by Supreme Auto Transport LLC (Miller, Marvin)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Commercial Metals, Inc. by David Edward Morgans (Morgans, David)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel:Application of Stephen D. Brown to appear pro hac vice #53 is granted. Application of David J. Stanoch to appear pro hac vice #55 is granted.Mailed notice (drw, )
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Commercial Metals, Inc. by David John Stanoch (Stanoch, David)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003455261. Motion for Leave by David J. Stanoch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Commercial Metals Company (Stanoch, David)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Commercial Metals, Inc. by Stephen D. Brown (Brown, Stephen)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003455226. Motion for Leave by Stephen D. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Commercial Metals Company (Brown, Stephen)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Commercial Metals, Inc. by Joseph A. Tate (Tate, Joseph)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003455152. Motion for Leave by Joseph A. Tate to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Commercial Metals Company (Tate, Joseph)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel:Application of Donna E. Patterson to appear pro hac vice #49 is granted.Mailed notice (drw, )
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nucor Corporation by Donna E Patterson (Patterson, Donna)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003415909. (Patterson, Donna)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Steel Dynamics, Inc. by Jeffrey M. Hammer (Hammer, Jeffrey)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel:Application to appear pro hac vice #43 is granted. Application to appear pro hac vice #44 is granted. Mailed notice (drw, )
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nucor Corporation by Doug Gunson (corrected) (Gunson, Doug)
December 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nucor Corporation by Doug Gunson (Gunson, Doug)
December 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003384955. (Gunson, Doug)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003380377. (Gersch, David)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AK Steel Holding Corporation by James R. Figliulo (Figliulo, James)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AK Steel Holding Corporation by Stephanie D. Jones (Jones, Stephanie)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Arcelor Mittal USA, Inc. (Lewis, Jonathan)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Arcelor Mittal USA, Inc. by Jonathan Lawrence Lewis (Lewis, Jonathan)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Arcelor Mittal USA, Inc. by Andrew Stanley Marovitz (Marovitz, Andrew)
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Nucor Corporation (Ehlman, Todd)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AK Steel Holding Corporation by Gregory A Markel (Markel, Gregory)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AK Steel Holding Corporation by Joseph J. Bial (Bial, Joseph)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Steel Dynamics, Inc. (Metts, Amanda)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Steel Dynamics, Inc. by Amanda Jo Metts (Metts, Amanda)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Steel Dynamics, Inc. by Joel Gerald Chefitz (Chefitz, Joel)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel:Status hearing held on 11/21/2008.Mailed notice (drw, )
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel:Motion hearing set for 11/21/2008 at 10:00 a.m. is stricken. Motion to appoint Christopher Lovell and Marvin Miller as interim lead counsel #16 is granted. Application to appear pro hac vice of Michelle Mantine #21 is granted. Application to appear pro hac vice of Alexander Thomas #25 is granted. Status hearing set for 11/21/2008 at 12:00 PM.Mailed notice (drw, )
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/06/2008 before the Honorable James B. Zagel. Court Reporter Contact Information: Rosemary Scarpelli, (312)435-5815, Rosemary_Scarpelli@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/9/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2009. (Scarpelli, Rosemary)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation by Claire Marguerite Korenblit (Korenblit, Claire)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation by David C. Giardina (Giardina, David)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003273838. (Thomas, Alexander)
November 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by United States Steel Corporation (Quinn, Jonathan)
November 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation by John W. Treece (Treece, John)
November 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation by Scott David Stein (Stein, Scott)
November 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003267732. (Mantine, Michelle)
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United States Steel Corporation by Jonathan Stuart Quinn (Quinn, Jonathan) Modified on 11/10/2008 (aac, ).
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel:Motion hearing held on 11/6/2008 regarding motion to appoint interim counsel #16 Motion hearing set for 11/21/2008 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice (drw, )
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:Status report filing date of 11/6/2008 and status hearing set for 11/12/2008 are vacated.Mailed notice (rao, )
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Marvin Alan Miller for presentment of motion to appoint counsel #16 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 11/6/2008 at 10:15 AM. (Miller, Marvin)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Supreme Auto Transport LLC in support of motion to appoint counsel #16 Memorandum in support of motion for appointment of interim lead counsel (Miller, Marvin)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION by Plaintiff Supreme Auto Transport LLC to appoint counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Counssel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Miller, Marvin)
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable James B. Zagel for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/30/2008. (aac, )
October 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation by John Kenneth Theis (Theis, John)
October 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation by Andrew George Klevorn (Klevorn, Andrew)
October 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation by Nathan P. Eimer (Eimer, Nathan)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:Parties to file a joint status report on or before 11/6/2008. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 11/12/2008 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice (rao, )
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nucor Corporation by Dan K. Webb (Webb, Dan)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nucor Corporation by Todd Jay Ehlman (Ehlman, Todd)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nucor Corporation by Thomas James Frederick (Frederick, Thomas)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Steel Dynamics, Inc., AK Steel Holding Corporation, SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation, Arcelor Mittal, Arcelor Mittal USA, Inc., United States Steel Corporation, Nucor Corporation, Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation. (aac, )
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Supreme Auto Transport LLC by Lori Ann Fanning. (aac, )
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Supreme Auto Transport LLC by Matthew E Van Tine. (aac, )
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Supreme Auto Transport LLC by Marvin Alan Miller. (aac, )
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (aac, )
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Supreme Auto Transport LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350.(aac, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Supreme Auto Transport LLC v. Arcelor Mittal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcelor Mittal USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin Weber Silverman
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Lewis
Represented By: Andrew Stanley Marovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSAB Swedish Steel Corporation
Represented By: John W. Treece
Represented By: Scott David Stein
Represented By: David C. Giardina
Represented By: Claire Marguerite Korenblit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Metals, Inc.
Represented By: Susan M Lorenc
Represented By: Floyd Babbitt
Represented By: David John Stanoch
Represented By: Stephen D. Brown
Represented By: Todd A. Rowden
Represented By: Christine C Levin
Represented By: Joseph A. Tate
Represented By: Dean L. Franklin
Represented By: David Edward Morgans
Represented By: Angela M. Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerdau Ameristeel Corporation
Represented By: Daniel D Birk
Represented By: Andrew George Klevorn
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: John Kenneth Theis
Represented By: Jacob Michael Hamann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AK Steel Holding Corporation
Represented By: Kevin J. Mahoney
Represented By: James R. Figliulo
Represented By: Joseph J. Bial
Represented By: Gregory A Markel
Represented By: Heather E. Murray
Represented By: Matthew C. Blickensderfer
Represented By: Stephanie D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Steel Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan Stuart Quinn
Represented By: Daniel I. Booker
Represented By: Michelle Ann Mantine
Represented By: Alexander Young Thomas
Represented By: Max A Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steel Dynamics, Inc.
Represented By: Joel Gerald Chefitz
Represented By: Katharine Maureen O'Connor
Represented By: Stephanie Lynne Poulos
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Hammer
Represented By: Michelle S. Lowery
Represented By: Chelsea L Black
Represented By: David L Hanselman, Jr
Represented By: Amanda Jo Metts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nucor Corporation
Represented By: Thomas James Frederick
Represented By: Donna E Patterson
Represented By: Ryan Zane Watts
Represented By: Robert Adam DeRise
Represented By: Dan K. Webb
Represented By: Robert Katerberg
Represented By: David Gersch
Represented By: Doug Gunson
Represented By: Todd Jay Ehlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcelor Mittal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Supreme Auto Transport LLC
Represented By: Keith Essenmacher
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller
Represented By: Matthew E Van Tine
Represented By: Lori Ann Fanning
Represented By: Craig Essenmacher
Represented By: Randall Keith Berger
Represented By: Andrew Szot
Represented By: Peggy J Wedgworth
Represented By: Christopher Lovell
Represented By: Merrick Scott Rayle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?