Berg v. eHomeCredit Corp.

Plaintiff: Ingrid Berg
Defendant: eHomeCredit Corp.
Case Number: 1:2008cv05530
Filed: September 26, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Consumer Credit Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Wayne R. Andersen
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2012 101 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/13/2012:This Court denies Mr. Tucker's Motion to Intervene 96 . Mr. Tucker's Motion to Prioritize the lien 97 is also denied. See Order for further detail. Mailed notice (For further detail see Written Opinion) (nf, )
January 25, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/25/2012:Mailed notice(keg, )
February 25, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/25/2011:Mailed notice(keg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berg v. eHomeCredit Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Berg
Represented By: Rod Radjenovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eHomeCredit Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?