Collier v. The City of Chicago

Plaintiff: Steven A. Collier
Defendant: The City of Chicago
Case Number: 1:2008cv05645
Filed: October 3, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2012 108 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 10/9/2012: For the reasons stated below, Plaintiffs motion to reconsider 100 is denied. Mailed notice(tbk, )
September 20, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/20/2011: For the reasons stated below, Plaintiffs motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal 88 is respectfully denied on the ground that the Court lacks jurisdiction to consider the motion. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
May 23, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 5/23/2011. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
February 4, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 2/4/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collier v. The City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven A. Collier
Represented By: Ivan Tomic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Chicago
Represented By: Jay Michael Kertez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?