Ammons v. Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago

Plaintiff: Tanya Ammons
Defendant: Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago
Case Number: 1:2008cv05663
Filed: October 3, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Joan B. Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2013 214 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 1/18/2013: Defendant Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago ("MWRD")'s motion for Bill of Costs [ 142 ] is denied. Although MWRD has established tha t it is entitled to reimbursement in the amount of $10,069.52 for witness fees, transcript fees, court reporter attendance, and copying costs, the court finds that Plaintiff has demonstrated that she is unable to pay assigned costs at this time or in the future. (For further details see Written Opinion). Mailed notice. (et, )
October 26, 2012 190 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 10/26/2012:Mailed notice(rj, )
March 1, 2012 160 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 3/1/2012. (et, )
November 9, 2011 157 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 11/9/2011. (et, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ammons v. Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Ammons
Represented By: Joel F. Handler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?