Hernandez v. Forest Preserve District of Cook County, Illinois,

Plaintiff: Gronimo Hernandez
Defendant: Forest Preserve District of Cook County, Illinois,
Case Number: 1:2008cv05731
Filed: October 7, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2012 100 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 1/3/2012: Following entry of judgment in its favor on September 21, 2011, Defendant submitted a bill of costs 96 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(d). The Court took the bil l of costs under advisement and gave Plaintiff until October 12, 2011, to object. Plaintiff filed his objections on October 12. For the reasons stated below, the Court grants in part Defendants request for costs 96 and awards Defendant $2,769.78 in costs. Mailed notice(tbk, )
September 21, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/21/2011. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff(tbk, )
March 29, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 3/29/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Forest Preserve District of Cook County, Illinois,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gronimo Hernandez
Represented By: Cynthia M. Rote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Preserve District of Cook County, Illinois,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?