Rojas v. Town of Cicero et al

Plaintiff: Merced Rojas
Defendant: Town of Cicero, Larry Dominick and Derek Dominick
Case Number: 1:2008cv05913
Filed: October 15, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: James F. Holderman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2015 711 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, and pursuant to the Seventh Circuit's mandate, the Court: (1) orders Kurtz to pay the attorney's fees that the defendants expended to bring the Rule 26 motion, and all briefing rel ated to it in this Court; and (2) censures Kurtz for her misconduct during discovery in this case. The Court directs the parties to comply with Local Rule 54.3 regarding the monetary sanction that the Court has imposed. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/22/2015:Mailed notice(srn, )
December 22, 2011 536 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 12/22/2011:For the reasons listed in the Statement section of the order, plaintiff Merced Rojas' "Motion for a New Trial on Plaintiff's Equal Protection Claim of Race Discr imination Only" 490 is denied, Defendants' "Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 50(b)" 486 is denied, and "Defendants' Motion for a New Trial Pursuant [to] F. R. Civ. P. 59(a) and Relief from Judgment Pursuant [to] F. R. Civ. P. 60(b)" 488 is granted. A new trial is granted on only Rojas' claim under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 of retaliation for political affiliation. A new trial is set to begin on 4/23/12 at 9:00 AM, and a final pretrial conference will be held at 4:00 PM on 4/17/12. "Defendants' Motion for Remittitur Pursuant to Rule 59(e)" 491 , "Plaintiff's Post-Trial Motion for Reinstatement" 492 , and Rojas' "Motion for Instructions Pursuant to ILND LR 54.3(g)" 499 are denied as moot. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 12/22/2011: Mailed notice (am)
August 17, 2011 495 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Plaintiff Merced Rojas for judgment Entry, Against Defendant Town of Cicero (Kurtz, Dana)
July 13, 2011 458 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 7/13/2011: The court provides its rulings on the parties' objections to the court's proposed damages instructions [441, 444] in the Statement section of this order.Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 7/13/2011: Mailed notice (am)
June 21, 2011 411 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 6/21/2011:For the reasons explained in the Statement section of this order, plaintiff Merced Rojas's ("Rojas") "Motion for Reconsideration of this Court's Order ( Docket #335) Regarding Monell Liability" 392 is granted. The court will permit Rojas to present evidence related to the Town's Monell liability based on either a widespread practice or final policymaker theory of liability. Because the identification of the final policymaker is a question of law for the court, the court will make its ruling on whether President Larry Dominick was a final policymaker after the jury reaches its verdict. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 6/21/2011: Mailed notice (am)
June 8, 2011 409 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 6/8/2011: For the reasons explained in the Statement section of this order, the jury will not be instructed on plaintiff Merced Rojas's ("Rojas") purported First Amendment familial association claim at trial. Rojas's "Motion for Discovery" related to Defendants' qualified immunity on Rojas's First Amendment familial association claim 372 is denied as moot. Mailed notice (am)
November 22, 2010 247 Opinion or Order of the Court Written Opinion: The Court submits to counsel the (Sample Form) Verdict of the Jury that the court, subject to hearing further from counsel at the pretrial conference set for 3:00 p.m. on November 29, 2010, intends to provide the jurors prior to open ing statements at the trial for the jurors' edification. The court will make a final determination as to the final verdict form after evaluating the evidence presented at the trial and after considering the parties' positions as articulated by counsel. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 11/22/2010: Mailed notice (am)
October 14, 2010 177 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 10/14/2010: Mailed notice (am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rojas v. Town of Cicero et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merced Rojas
Represented By: Dana L. Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Cicero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Dominick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Dominick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?