McDavid Knee Guard, Inc. et al v. Nike USA, Inc.

Plaintiff: McDavid Knee Guard, Inc. and Stirling Mouldings Limited
Defendant: Nike USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv06584
Filed: November 17, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: Du Page
Presiding Judge: Suzanne B. Conlon
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2013 604 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Nike's motion to strike portions of McDavid's expert reports 581 is granted in part and denied in part, as follows: (1) The court strikes Beall's supplemental expert report of March 22, 2013, in its ent irety; and (2) the court strikes the portions of McGovern's supplemental expert report of March 22, 2013, dealing with McGovern's alternative damages theory apportioning the value of Nike's sales of the allegedly infringing products be tween the features resulting from the accused process and other features of the product. [581, Ex. B.) Nike may depose McGovern, if it desires, on a mutually agreeable date on or before 5/3/13. Nike's 26(e)(2) supplementation is due 5/13/13. All other dates set on 11/27/12 559 remain in effect, including that the Final Pretrial Order must be submitted to the court through the Proposed_Order_Holderman@ilnd.uscourts.gov e-mail address by 5/21/13. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 4/23/2013: Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
November 9, 2012 558 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 11/9/2012. Notice mailed by judge's staff(ntf, )
September 19, 2012 525 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 9/19/2012. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
March 5, 2012 450 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 3/5/2012: Mailed notice (am)
October 19, 2011 366 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 10/19/2011: For the reasons explained in the Statement section of this order, plaintiffs' "Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Nike's Motion for Summary judgment o f Non-infringement of claim 1 of the '346 Patent Under the Doctrine of Equivalents" 350 is denied. Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint 363 is still pending. The court will set further dates in the ruling on that motion. The parties are once again encouraged to discuss settlement. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 10/19/2011: Mailed notice (am)
August 17, 2011 345 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 8/17/2011:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )
July 28, 2010 269 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 7/28/2010: Mailed notice (am)
January 14, 2010 173 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 1/14/2010: Mailed notice (am)
September 17, 2009 137 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order.Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 9/17/2009: Mailed notice (am)
June 9, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Michael T. Mason on 6/9/2009.(rbf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDavid Knee Guard, Inc. et al v. Nike USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McDavid Knee Guard, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Bernard Henkelmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stirling Mouldings Limited
Represented By: Paul Bernard Henkelmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nike USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?