Plyler v. Whirlpool Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Allen Plyler
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation, Best Buy Co., Inc. and Leviton Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv06637
Filed: November 19, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: Du Page
Presiding Judge: Harry D. Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2012 194 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 11/19/2012.(psm, )
July 3, 2012 174 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 7/3/2012. Notice mailed by judge's staff(ntf, )
June 5, 2012 171 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE entry before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Defendant has submitted a bill of costs and an amended bill of costs with an attached "description" of items contained therein [159, 168]. For the reasons stated below, defendant's a ttached description does not provide the court with sufficient information to determine whether the requested costs were reasonable and necessary. Defendant may provide the court with additional information in support of its bill of costs by 6/19/12. If defendant does so, plaintiff is given to 7/3/12 to supplement his objections to the bill of costs. [For further details see minute order.] Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
February 13, 2012 129 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 2/13/2012. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plyler v. Whirlpool Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Plyler
Represented By: Scott Skaletsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Marc Steven Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Co., Inc.
Represented By: Brian James Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leviton Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?