Blackman v. City Chicago et al

Plaintiff: Sedenia Blackman
Defendant: City Chicago, Thomas O'Shaughnessy and Christopher Rigan
Case Number: 1:2008cv06902
Filed: December 3, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Amy J. St. Eve
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2012 126 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/27/2012:Mailed notice(kef, )
January 11, 2012 120 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/11/2012: The Court grants Defendants' motion in limine #1 to exclude the expert testimony of Mr. Andrew Hall 88 . [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
December 8, 2011 113 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/8/2011: The Court grants Plaintiff's motion in limine #1, grants in part and denies in part Plaintiff's motion in limine #2, and denies Plaintiff's motions in limine #3 and #4 93 . [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackman v. City Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sedenia Blackman
Represented By: Benjamin Obi Nwoye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas O'Shaughnessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Rigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?