Lobrow v. Oaks et al

Plaintiff: Bogumila Lobrow
Defendant: Patricia Oaks, Village of Port Barrington, JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association and Kirk Corporation
Case Number: 1:2008cv06978
Filed: December 5, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Norgle
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1985 Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2012 133 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 3/19/2012:Defendant's motion for fees 122 is granted in part and denied in part. Defendant is awarded $15,417.50 in fees, which Plaintiff shall pay by April 30, 2012. [For further details see written opinion.] Mailed notice (ph, )
March 8, 2012 131 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 3/8/2012:Lobrow must file materials regarding Defendant's motion for fees 122 on or before March 15, 2012. There will be no further extensions. [For further details see written opinion.] Mailed notice.(mr, )
February 7, 2011 104 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. on 2/7/2011: Defendant Village of Port Barrington's Motion for sanctions 66 , 68 , 69 is Denied. Mailed notice (ph, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lobrow v. Oaks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bogumila Lobrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Oaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Port Barrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?