Smith v. Hunt et al

Plaintiff: Gregory Smith
Defendant: Jalate Hunt and J Cortes
Case Number: 1:2008cv06982
Filed: December 5, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Contract: Insurance Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Kendall
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion: Page 2 of the courts order in document 94 . Advised in open court(tsa, )
January 3, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 1/3/2011: During the Final Pretrial Conference held in this case on December 15, 2010, the Court made the following rulings:The Court grants Plaintiff's oral Motion to Voluntarily Dismi ss Counts II (common law battery), V (common law battery), and VIII (indemnification) of Smith's Second Amended Complaint. The Court grants Plaintiff's oral Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss any claim for punitive damages against the Defendant s in this case. The Court grants in part, denies in part, and takes under advisement in part Plaintiff's Motions in Limine 77 . The Court grants in part, denies in part, and takes under advisement in part Defendants' oral motion to exclude witness Myron Perkins from testifying about the December 28, 2007 incident and Defendants' three Motions in Limine 83 .Mailed notice(dl, )
September 27, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/27/2010.(tsa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Hunt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Neslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jalate Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Cortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?