In re Text Messaging Antitrust Litigation

In Re: Text Messaging Antitrust Litigation
Case Number: 1:2008cv07082
Filed: December 3, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Anti-Trust Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2014 945 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/2/2014: For the reasons stated in the accompanying decision, the Court approves defendants' bills of costs in part. The parties are to confer to attempt to agree upon the specific amounts properly awardable pursuant to this decision and are to file a joint status report in this regard by no later than September 16, 2014. Payment of the award of costs is stayed during the pendency of plaintiffs' appeal of the Court's entry of judgment against them. (mk)
May 19, 2014 918 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order written by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/19/2014. For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a surreply [docket no. 893 ]; denies plaintiffs' motion for an adverse inference and sanctions [docket no. 743 ]; and grants the defendants' motion for summary judgment [docket no. 739 ]. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendants.(pjg, )
December 10, 2009 130 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/10/2009:(gcy, )
August 13, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/13/2009. Mailed notice.(srb,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Text Messaging Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Text Messaging Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?