Echo, Incorporated v. Timberland Machines & Irrigation, Inc.

Plaintiff: Echo, Incorporated
Defendant: Timberland Machines & Irrigation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv07123
Filed: December 11, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Charles P. Kocoras
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2011 161 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 1/18/2011.Mailed notice(sct, )
August 26, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/26/2009.Mailed notice(sct, )
March 5, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 3/5/2009.Mailed notice(sct, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Echo, Incorporated v. Timberland Machines & Irrigation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Echo, Incorporated
Represented By: Jason Michael Metnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timberland Machines & Irrigation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?