Owens v. Acevedo et al

Plaintiff: Lawrence Owens
Defendant: Gerardo Acevedo
Case Number: 1:2008cv07159
Filed: January 27, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus Office
County: Knox
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R. Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2015 178 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, Respondent's Motion to Recall Writ of Habeas Corpus 176 is denied. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/13/2015:Mailed notice(srn, )
February 11, 2014 153 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order:For the foregoing reasons, Owens's petition for a writ of habeas corpus is denied, and the Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability for any of his claims. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 2/11/2014:Mailed notice(srn, )
May 29, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/29/2012: Mailed notice(etv, )
April 23, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/23/2012: Mailed notice(etv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. Acevedo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerardo Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?