Trustees of the Automobile Mechanics Local No. 701 Pension and Welfare Funds v. Union Bank of California, N.A.

Plaintiff: Trustees of the Automobile Mechanics Local No. 701 Pension and Welfare Funds
Defendant: Union Bank of California, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2008cv07217
Filed: December 17, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2009 132 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 12/2/2009:Mailed notice(srn, )
November 17, 2009 128 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 11/17/2009:MAiled notice(srn, )
October 14, 2009 119 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 10/14/2009:Mailed notice(srn, )
July 20, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/20/2009:Mailed notice(srn, )
July 1, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/1/2009:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 12, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 6/12/2009:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 21, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 4/21/2009:Mailed notice(srn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Automobile Mechanics Local No. 701 Pension and Welfare Funds v. Union Bank of California, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Automobile Mechanics Local No. 701 Pension and Welfare Funds
Represented By: Anthony Brian Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Bank of California, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?