Pfizer Inc. et al v. Apotex Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Pfizer Inc., Prizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals, Warner-Lambert Company and Warner-Lambert Company LLC
Defendant: Apotex Inc. and Apotex Corp.
Case Number: 1:2008cv07231
Filed: December 17, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:145 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2010 230 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Martin C. Ashman on 9/29/2010. (ber, )
August 4, 2010 174 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Martin C. Ashman on 8/4/2010. (ber, )
June 30, 2010 144 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/30/2010: Mailed notice(tbk, )
June 12, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/12/2009.Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pfizer Inc. et al v. Apotex Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Lambert Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Lambert Company LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?