Philos Technologies, Inc. v. Philos & D Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Philos Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Philos & D Inc., Don-Hee Park and Jaehee Park
Case Number: 1:2008cv07240
Filed: December 18, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Personal Property: Other Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: William J. Hibbler
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2014 201 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 4/30/2014. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
April 8, 2014 197 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 4/8/2014. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
March 17, 2014 193 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 3/17/2014. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
September 20, 2013 176 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 9/20/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
May 8, 2013 171 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 5/8/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
August 15, 2012 105 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/15/2012:Mailed notice(srn, )
May 22, 2012 100 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 5/22/2012:Mailed notice(srn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philos Technologies, Inc. v. Philos & D Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philos Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: David Lesht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philos & D Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don-Hee Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaehee Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?