O'Leary v. Kaupas et al

Plaintiff: Marlis O'Leary
Defendant: Paul Kaupas, Michael Harkins, Sergeant Luna, Ron Adams, Chris Wilhelmi, Marty Shifflet, Gabriel Alvarado, Sergeant Zaragosa and Sergeant Chester
Case Number: 1:2008cv07246
Filed: December 18, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Will
Presiding Judge: Charles P. Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2013 362 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendants Paul Kaupas, Will County Sheriff's Office for judgment Amended Motionfor Judgment as a Matter of Law on Plaintiff's Title VII Claim, and in the Alternative, as to its Ellerth/Faragher Defense (Moran, Patrick)
February 24, 2013 354 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant Paul Kaupas for judgment as to Plaintiff's Title VII claim, and in the alternative as to Defendant's Ellerth/Faragher affirmative defense (Moran, Patrick)
July 11, 2012 241 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/11/2012: Defendant Kaupas's motion (Doc 234 ) to strike plaintiff's expert disclosures is denied. Parties are given to August 31, 2012 to file the Final Pretrial Order - Sho rt Form (www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/JUDGES/KOCORAS/pto-shortform.pdf), and proposed voir dire. Counsel are to meet, confer and agree on jury instructions to the best of their ability. Seventh Circuit jury instructions are preferred. Proposed jury instructions are also due by August 31, 2012. (For further details see minute order.) Mailed notice(sct, )
April 11, 2012 230 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 4/11/2012: Defendants Harkins, Zaragoza, Chester, Alvarado, Adams, Wilhelmi and Kaupas' motion (Doc 217 ) for entry of dismissal with prejudice and for a Rule 54(b) finding is denied. (For further details see minute order.)Mailed notice(sct, )
January 4, 2012 214 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 1/4/2012.Mailed notice(sct, )
October 19, 2010 158 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 10/19/2010.Mailed notice(sct, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Leary v. Kaupas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlis O'Leary
Represented By: Jessica Rae Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Kaupas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Harkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Wilhelmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Shifflet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Zaragosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?