Chiriboga v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al

Plaintiff: John Chiriboga
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation and Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Railroad Corporation
Case Number: 1:2008cv07293
Filed: December 22, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Charles P. Kocoras
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2011 179 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 10/7/2011.Mailed notice(sct, )
June 9, 2011 152 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 6/9/2011.Mailed notice(sct, )
September 3, 2009 73 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 9/3/2009.Mailed notice(sct, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chiriboga v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Chiriboga
Represented By: Laura Paige Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Railroad Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?