21 srl v. Apple Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: 21 srl
Defendant: Apple Inc., CDW Corporation, OfficeMax Incorporated and Walgreen Co.
Case Number: 1:2008cv07350
Filed: December 23, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Joan B. Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1338 Patent Infringement

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2009 52 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Enter Stipulated Order of Dismissal with Respect to Defendant Officemax. Enter Stipulated Order of Dismissal with Respect to Defendant CDW. Joint motion for entry of stipulated orders of dismissal 49 is granted. Civil case terminated. Civil case terminated. (For further detail see separate order(s).) Mailed notice (ep, )
March 31, 2009 54 STIPULATED Order of Dismissal with Respect to Defendant OfficeMax. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 3/31/2009. (ep, )
March 31, 2009 53 STIPULATED Order of Dismissal with Respect to Defendant CDW. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 3/31/2009. (ep, )
March 31, 2009 51 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall:Status hearing set for 4/1/09 is stricken. Dismissal order to issue shortly. No appearance required 4/1/09 or 4/2/09. Mailed notice (rj, )
March 30, 2009 50 Joint NOTICE of Motion by Raymond Pardo Niro, Jr for presentment of motion for order 49 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 4/2/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Niro, Raymond)
March 30, 2009 49 MOTION by Plaintiff 21 srl, Defendants CDW Corporation, OfficeMax Incorporated for order entry of Stipulated Orders of Dismissal (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order CDW, # 2 Text of Proposed Order OfficeMax)(Niro, Raymond)
March 3, 2009 48 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Walgreen Co. 47 , all claims made in this action against Defendant Walgreen Co. only are dismissed with prejudice, with each party bearing its own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees. Mailed notice (ep, )
March 2, 2009 47 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and WITHDRAWAL of Claim with respect to Walgreen Co. Only (Niro, Raymond)
February 27, 2009 46 Plaintiff's ANSWER to counterclaim of CDW by 21 srl(Niro, Raymond)
February 25, 2009 45 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: MOTION by Defendant OfficeMax Incorporated for extension of time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by 3/4/2009 41 is granted; Status hearing held on 2/25/2009; ( Status hearing set for 4/1/2009 at 10:00 AM.) Mailed notice (rj, )
February 19, 2009 44 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Motion for extension of time to answer 36 is denied without prejudice for failure to deliver a courtesy copy to chambers as required. Mailed notice (rj, )
February 18, 2009 42 NOTICE of Motion by Robert Loren Wagner for presentment of extension of time 41 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 2/26/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Wagner, Robert)
February 18, 2009 41 MOTION by Defendant OfficeMax Incorporated for extension of time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint (Wagner, Robert)
February 18, 2009 40 CDW Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM filed by CDW Corporation against 21 srl. by CDW Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Gabrielson, Anthony)
February 12, 2009 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Enter Order of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Apple Inc. All attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. (For further detail see separate order(s).) Mailed notice (ep, )
February 12, 2009 39 Featured Case ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 2/12/2009. (ep, )
February 12, 2009 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Joint motion for entry of order of dismissal with prejudice. Enter Order Dismissal with Prejudice. It is therefore ordered that any and all claims for relief asserted against Apple Inc. By 21 srl. and against 21 srl by Apple Inc. herein are dismissed with prejudice. It is further ordered that all attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. (For further detail see separate order(s).) Mailed notice (ep, )
February 12, 2009 37 NOTICE of Motion by Robert Loren Wagner for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief 36 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 2/19/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Wagner, Robert)
February 12, 2009 36 MOTION by Defendant OfficeMax Incorporated for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint 1 (Wagner, Robert)
February 6, 2009 35 Joint NOTICE of Motion by Raymond Pardo Niro, Jr for presentment of motion for order 34 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 2/12/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Niro, Raymond)
February 6, 2009 34 MOTION by Plaintiff 21 srl, Defendant Apple Inc. for order of dismissal with prejudice re Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Niro, Raymond)
January 22, 2009 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Defendant Apple Inc.'s unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead by 2/18/2009 23 is granted. Officemax's agreed motion for an extension of time to answer Plaintiff's complaint by 2/18/2009 30 is granted. No appearance required 1/29/2009. ( Status hearing set for 2/25/2009 at 10:00 AM.)Mailed notice (rj, )
January 21, 2009 32 NOTICE of Motion by John Sheldon Letchinger for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief 30 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 1/29/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Letchinger, John)
January 20, 2009 31 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant OfficeMax Incorporated by Robert Loren Wagner (Wagner, Robert)
January 20, 2009 30 MOTION by Defendant OfficeMax Incorporated for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint 1 (Agreed) (Letchinger, John)
January 16, 2009 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 21 srl as to Walgreen Co. on 12/31/2008, answer due 1/20/2009. (Haan, Brian)
January 16, 2009 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 21 srl as to OfficeMax Incorporated on 12/30/2008, answer due 1/20/2009. (Haan, Brian)
January 16, 2009 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 21 srl as to CDW Corporation on 1/2/2009, answer due 1/22/2009. (Haan, Brian)
January 16, 2009 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 21 srl as to Apple Inc. on 1/5/2009, answer due 1/26/2009. (Haan, Brian)
January 16, 2009 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Apple Inc. by Neel Uday Sukhatme (Sukhatme, Neel)
January 16, 2009 24 NOTICE of Motion by Tigran Vardanian for presentment of extension of time 23 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 1/22/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Vardanian, Tigran)
January 16, 2009 23 MOTION by Defendant Apple Inc. for extension of time - Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Vardanian, Tigran)
January 16, 2009 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Apple Inc. by Tigran Vardanian (Vardanian, Tigran)
January 16, 2009 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Apple Inc. by David Aaron Nelson (Nelson, David)
January 15, 2009 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Defendant CDW Corporation's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead by 2/18/2009 17 is granted. Mailed notice (rj, )
January 12, 2009 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant OfficeMax Incorporated by John Sheldon Letchinger (Letchinger, John)
January 9, 2009 18 NOTICE of Motion by Anthony S. Gabrielson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 17 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 1/15/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Gabrielson, Anthony)
January 9, 2009 17 MOTION by Defendant CDW Corporation for extension of time to file answer (Gabrielson, Anthony)
January 9, 2009 16 NOTICE by Anthony S. Gabrielson of Change of Address (Gabrielson, Anthony)
January 6, 2009 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CDW Corporation by Anthony S. Gabrielson (Gabrielson, Anthony)
January 6, 2009 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CDW Corporation by Thomas L. Duston (Duston, Thomas)
January 5, 2009 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff 21 srl by Raymond Pardo Niro, Jr (Niro, Raymond)
January 5, 2009 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Status hearing set for 2/25/2009 at 09:30 AM. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendants of the status hearing forthwith. Parties are directed to discuss settlement of case, consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge and a proposed discovery plan. Mailed notice (rj, )
December 23, 2008 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Apple Inc., CDW Corporation, OfficeMax Incorporated, Walgreen Co. (ep, )
December 23, 2008 7 NOTICE by Plaintiff 21 srl of Claims Involving Patent Pursuant to Local Rule 3.4. (ep, )
December 23, 2008 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates-Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Plaintiff 21 srl. (ep, )
December 23, 2008 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff 21 srl by Brian Erik Haan. (ep, )
December 23, 2008 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff 21 srl by Anna B. Folgers. (ep, )
December 23, 2008 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff 21 srl by Raymond P. Niro. (ep, )
December 23, 2008 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ep, )
December 23, 2008 1 COMPLAINT filed by 21 srl; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A). (ep, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 21 srl v. Apple Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 21 srl
Represented By: Raymond P. Niro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDW Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OfficeMax Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?