Sentinel Management Group, Inc.et al v. FC Stone LLC
Plaintiff: Sentinel Management Group, Inc.
Defendant: FC Stone LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv00136
Filed: January 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Joan H. Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 339 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/23/2018. Mailed notice. (etv, )
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 289 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, judgment is entered in FC Stone's favor on Counts I, II, IV and V and judgment is entered in the Trustee's favor on Count III. See Order for further details. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable James B. Zagel on 3/28/2016. Mailed notice(ep, )
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 276 MOTION by Defendant FC Stone LLC for judgment on Counts I, II, IV and V of the Trustee's Second Amended Complaint (Bedell, Stephen)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 272 MOTION by Plaintiff Frederick J. Grede for judgment /Motion for Judgment on Counts I, III and V (Lazar, Vincent)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER with findings of fact and conclusions of law. Mailed notice(drw, )
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Minute entry before Honorable James B. Zagel: Because Count V does not contravene the terms of the Plan or the Stipulation, res judicata is no bar to that count. The motion to dismiss Count V of the Second Amended Complaint 102 is DENIED. Mailed notice(drw, ) Modified on 8/9/2012 (drw, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sentinel Management Group, Inc.et al v. FC Stone LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sentinel Management Group, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine L. Steege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FC Stone LLC
Represented By: Jill L. Murch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?