Dual-Temp of Illinois, Inc. v. Hench Control Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Dual-Temp of Illinois, Inc.
Defendant: Hench Control Corporation, Hench Control, Inc., Caesar-Verona, Inc, John Hench and Alex Daneman
Case Number: 1:2009cv00595
Filed: January 30, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2016 381 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/17/2016:Mailed notice(rth, )
June 23, 2015 327 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 6/23/2015:Mailed notice(rth, )
November 17, 2014 303 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 11/17/2014:Mailed notice(rth, )
September 30, 2014 278 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/30/2014:Mailed notice(rth, )
February 6, 2013 234 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/6/2013:Mailed notice(rth, )
May 2, 2011 149 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 5/2/2011:Mailed notice(keg, )
December 4, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 12/4/2009. Mailed notice(tbk, )
September 28, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/28/2009.Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dual-Temp of Illinois, Inc. v. Hench Control Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dual-Temp of Illinois, Inc.
Represented By: Mark H. Schiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hench Control Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hench Control, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caesar-Verona, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hench
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Daneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?