Heneghan v. City of Chicago Aviation Police Dept. et al

Case Number: 1:2009cv00759
Filed: February 5, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
Presiding Judge: Harry D. Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2011 187 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/3/2011: Defendants' Bill of Costs is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff is liable to Defendants in the amount of $11,346.66.Mailed notice(wp, )
April 18, 2011 107 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 4/18/2011: For the reasons stated herein, Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification 103 is granted.Mailed notice(wp, )
December 8, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 12/8/2010:Mailed notice(wp, )
September 14, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Defendant City of Chicago's Motion for Reconsideration 52 is denied. Plaintiff's Petition for Attorney Fees 60 is granted in part, and Defendant City of Chicago is ordered to pay $4,038.14 to Plaintiff. Mailed notice(wp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heneghan v. City of Chicago Aviation Police Dept. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?