van Straaten v. Shell Oil Products Company LLC et al

Plaintiff: Natalie van Straaten
Defendant: Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Equilon Enterprises LLC and Shell Oil Company
Case Number: 1:2009cv01188
Filed: February 24, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Cook
Referring Judge: Arlander Keys
Presiding Judge: Blanche M. Manning
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2011 153 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/26/2011:Mailed notice(rth, )
July 7, 2011 122 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 7/7/2011: Ms. Van Straaten shall file a public version of her summary judgment response memorandum by July 18, 2011, as detailed below. It should also provide the court with a courtesy co py of the sealed version of its filing, with the sealed portions highlighted so the court can distinguish between the sealed and public portions of the filing. In addition, all counsel should ensure that all summary judgment filings filed under seal comply with this order, and may file corrected public/sealed versions as necessary by July 18, 2011, if anything was filed under seal improperly. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice (ph, )
September 20, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court Accordingly, in an exercise of its discretion, and under both an abuse of discretion or de novo standard of review, the court accepts Magistrate Judge Keys' R&R [#58]. Ms. Van Straaten's motion to strike [#45] is granted. The defendants 9; objection [#64] to Magistrate Judge Key's R&R [#58] is overruled. Accordingly, by 9/30/2010, the defendants must prepare and serve a revised motion for summary judgment and related filings as detailed in this order. The plaintiff shall serve her response by 10/28/2010, the defendants shall file their reply by 11/11/2010, and the parties shall file their respective documents by 11/12/2010. WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/20/2010:Mailed notice(rth, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: van Straaten v. Shell Oil Products Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie van Straaten
Represented By: John R. Wylie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Products Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equilon Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?