Dart v. Craigslist, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Thomas Dart
Defendant: Craigslist, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01385
Filed: March 5, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John F. Grady
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2009 47 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John F. Grady on 10/20/2009.(vcf, )
October 20, 2009 46 Featured Case JUDGMENT ORDER Signed by the Honorable John F. Grady on 10/20/2009.Mailed notice(vcf, )
October 20, 2009 45 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Grady: Defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings (12) is granted. ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION.Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 7, 2009 44 Featured Case REPLY by Defendant Craigslist, Inc. to response in opposition to motion, 28 CORRECTED COPY (Brandfonbrener, Eric)
August 6, 2009 43 Featured Case REPLY by Defendant Craigslist, Inc. to response in opposition to motion, 28 (Reply in further support of Motion) (Brandfonbrener, Eric)
August 6, 2009 42 Featured Case CERTIFICATE of Service re Brief of Amicus Curiae, The Coalition Against Trafficking in Women (Yanos, Alexander)
August 6, 2009 41 Featured Case Brief of Amicus Curiae, The Coalition Against Trafficking in Women by The Coalition Against Trafficking in Women (CATW) (Yanos, Alexander)
August 4, 2009 40 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Unknown The Coalition Against Trafficking in Women by Alexander Athan Yanos (Yanos, Alexander)
August 4, 2009 39 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Unknown The Coalition Against Trafficking in Women by Ruth M Teitelbaum (Teitelbaum, Ruth)
July 21, 2009 38 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Grady:Attorney Ruth M. Teitelbaum is given leave to file her appearance as counsel for The Coalition Against Trafficking in Women. Alexander Athan Yanos is given leave to file an appearance as counsel for The Coalition Against Trafficking in Women. Mailed notice (jlj, )
July 16, 2009 37 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Grady: Craigslist to file a reply brief in support of its motion for judgment on the pleadings (12) by 08/06/2009. Motions for leave to appear pro hac vice (24) (25) are denied without prejudice. Motion by defendant Craigslist, Inc. to strike appearance of nonparty (30) is denied without prejudice. Motion by unknown The Coalition Against Trafficking in Women for leave to appear as amicus curiae (32) is denied without prejudice. Motion by plaintiff Thomas Dart for joinder (35) is denied without prejudice. The Coalition Against Trafficking in Women is given leave to file a amicus brief not to exceed 15 pages including any attachment or exhibits by 08/06/2009.Mailed notice (vcf, )
July 10, 2009 36 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Francis Gallagher for presentment of motion for joinder 35 before Honorable John F. Grady on 7/16/2009 at 11:00 AM. (Gallagher, Daniel)
July 10, 2009 35 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiff Thomas Dart for joinder (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part I of III), # 2 Exhibit A (Part II of III), # 3 Exhibit A (Part III of III))(Gallagher, Daniel)
July 10, 2009 34 Featured Case CERTIFICATE of Service of Notice of Motion and Declaration in Support of Motion of the Coalition Against Trafficking in Women to Appear as Amicus Curiae (Yanos, Alexander)
July 10, 2009 33 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Alexander Athan Yanos for presentment of motion for leave to appear 32 before Honorable John F. Grady on 7/16/2009 at 11:00 AM. (Yanos, Alexander)
July 10, 2009 32 Featured Case MOTION by Unknown The Coalition Against Trafficking in Women for leave to appear as amicus curiae (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I)(Yanos, Alexander)
July 10, 2009 31 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Eric D. Brandfonbrener for presentment of motion to strike 30 before Honorable John F. Grady on 7/16/2009 at 11:00 AM. (Brandfonbrener, Eric)
July 10, 2009 30 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant Craigslist, Inc. to strike Appearance of Nonparty (Brandfonbrener, Eric)
July 10, 2009 29 Featured Case NOTICE by Thomas Dart re response in opposition to motion, 28 (Gallagher, Daniel)
July 10, 2009 28 Featured Case RESPONSE by Thomas Dartin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Craigslist, Inc. for judgment on the pleadings craigslist's Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings 12 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Gallagher, Daniel)
July 8, 2009 27 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Grady:Oral motion to withdraw counsel for plaintiff is granted. Attorney Lawrence S. Kowalczyk is given leave to withdraw as counsel for the plaintiff. Attorney Lawrence S. Kowalczyk terminated.Mailed/Telephoned notice (jlj, )
July 6, 2009 26 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Francis Gallagher for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice 25 , motion to appear pro hac vice 24 before Honorable John F. Grady on 7/16/2009 at 11:00 AM. (Gallagher, Daniel)
July 6, 2009 25 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003901533. (Yanos, Alexander)
July 6, 2009 24 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003901466. (Teitelbaum, Ruth)
July 6, 2009 23 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for The Coalition Against Trafficking in Women (CATW), as amicus curiae (Gallagher, Daniel)
July 6, 2009 22 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Thomas Dart by Lawrence S. Kowalczyk (Kowalczyk, Lawrence)
June 9, 2009 21 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Grady:Motion for extension of time to file response to defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings 12 is granted 18 . Response due by 7/10/2009; reply due by 7/24/2009. Hearing set for 06/10/2009 is stricken.Mailed notice (jlj, )
June 8, 2009 20 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Grady:Motion hearing set for 6/10/2009 at 11:00 a.m. is reset to be heard at 9:30 a.m. due to the trial calendar of this court.Mailed notice (jlj, )
June 8, 2009 19 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Francis Gallagher for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief 18 before Honorable John F. Grady on 6/10/2009 at 11:00 AM. (Gallagher, Daniel)
June 8, 2009 18 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiff Thomas Dart for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for judgment on the pleadings 12 (Gallagher, Daniel)
May 13, 2009 17 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Grady: Motion hearing held on 5/13/2009 regarding motion for judgment on the pleadings 12 . Response to motion for judgment on the pleadings 12 due by 6/10/2009; reply due by 6/24/2009. Motion for judgment on the pleadings 12 is taken under advisement.Mailed notice (jlj, )
May 11, 2009 16 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Grady:Motion for judgment on the pleadings 12 is entered and continued to 5/13/2009 at 9:30 a.m. Hearing set for 5/13/2009 at 11:00 a.m. is stricken and reset to 5/13/2009 at 9:30 a.m. due to the trial schedule of this court.Mailed notice (jlj, )
May 6, 2009 15 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Grady:Hearing on Craiglist's motion for summary judgment set for 5/12/2009 is stricken and reset to 5/13/2009 at 11:00 a.m.Mailed notice (jlj, )
May 4, 2009 14 Featured Case MEMORANDUM by Craigslist, Inc. in support of motion for judgment on the pleadings 12 Memorandum In Support Of Craiglist's Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Brandfonbrener, Eric)
May 4, 2009 13 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Eric D. Brandfonbrener for presentment of motion for judgment on the pleadings 12 before Honorable John F. Grady on 5/12/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Brandfonbrener, Eric)
May 4, 2009 12 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant Craigslist, Inc. for judgment on the pleadings craigslist's Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings (Brandfonbrener, Eric)
May 4, 2009 11 Featured Case Answer With Additional Defenses ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Craigslist, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9)(Brandfonbrener, Eric)
April 22, 2009 10 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Grady:Motion for leave to file memorandum in excess of 15 pages but no more than 25 pages 8 is granted. Hearing set for 4/23/09 is stricken.Mailed/Telephoned notice (jlj, )
April 21, 2009 9 Featured Case Notice of Agreed Motion NOTICE of Motion by Eric D. Brandfonbrener for presentment of motion for leave to file 8 before Honorable John F. Grady on 4/23/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Brandfonbrener, Eric)
April 21, 2009 8 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant Craigslist, Inc. for leave to file Memoranda In Excess Of 15 Pages [AGREED] (Brandfonbrener, Eric)
April 21, 2009 7 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Craigslist, Inc. by Eric D. Brandfonbrener (Brandfonbrener, Eric)
March 5, 2009 5 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Thomas Dart by Paul A O'Grady. (vcf, )
March 5, 2009 4 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Thomas Dart by Daniel Francis Gallagher. (vcf, )
March 5, 2009 3 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Thomas Dart by Christopher Paul Keleher. (vcf, )
March 5, 2009 2 Featured Case CIVIL Cover Sheet. (vcf, )
March 5, 2009 1 Featured Case COMPLAINT filed by Thomas Dart; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1)( Poor Quality Original- Paper Document on File)(vcf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dart v. Craigslist, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Dart
Represented By: Paul A OGrady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craigslist, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?