Schaeffler Group, Inc. v. DeWind, Inc.

Plaintiff: Schaeffler Group, Inc.
Defendant: DeWind, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01430
Filed: March 6, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 3/30/2009:Mailed notice(srn, )
March 23, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 3/23/2009:Mailed notice(srn, )
March 10, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 3/10/2009:Mailed notice(srn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaeffler Group, Inc. v. DeWind, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schaeffler Group, Inc.
Represented By: David J Moorhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeWind, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?