Scarlato v. Village of Bellwood, Illinois

Plaintiff: Ronald Scarlato
Defendant: Village of Bellwood, Illinois
Case Number: 1:2009cv01497
Filed: March 9, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2010 115 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 2/3/2010:Mailed notice(srn, )
January 4, 2010 105 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 1/4/2010:Mailed notice(srn, )
July 30, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/30/2009:MAiled notice(srn, )
July 9, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/9/2009:Mailed notice(srn, )
July 8, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/8/2009:Mailed notice(srn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scarlato v. Village of Bellwood, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Scarlato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Bellwood, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?