L. v. Health Care Service Corporation

Plaintiff: Justine L.
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation
Case Number: 1:2009cv01588
Filed: March 13, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: William J. Hibbler
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2011 105 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable William J. Hibbler on 8/10/2011.(mr, )
July 13, 2011 96 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation for judgment Entry of Judgment (Witt, Helen)
January 20, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable William J. Hibbler on 1/20/2010. (aac, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L. v. Health Care Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justine L.
Represented By: Elizabeth Daley Hoskins Dow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?