Fish et al v. Greatbanc Trust Company et al

Plaintiff: Bonnie Fish, Christopher Mino, Monica Lee Woosley and Lynda D. Hardman
Defendant: Greatbanc Trust Company, Lee Morgan, Asha Morgan Moran and Chandra Attiken
Case Number: 1:2009cv01668
Filed: March 17, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2015 426 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. The Court denies defendant Morgan Family Foundation's motion to dismiss 386 . Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 6/12/2015. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
October 23, 2013 354 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTER MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 10/23/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
August 19, 2013 333 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/19/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
April 22, 2013 313 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 4/22/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
September 12, 2012 267 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 9/12/2012: This is a corrected version - Document #266 is stricken from the docket.Mailed notice(srn, )
August 31, 2010 169 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/31/2010:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 19, 2010 139 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 4/19/2010:Mailed notice(srn, )
November 5, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 11/5/2009:Mailed notice(srn, )
August 17, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/17/2009:Mailed notice(srn, )
August 12, 2009 73 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/12/2009:Mailed notice(srn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fish et al v. Greatbanc Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Fish
Represented By: John R. Wylie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Mino
Represented By: John R. Wylie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Lee Woosley
Represented By: John R. Wylie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynda D. Hardman
Represented By: John R. Wylie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greatbanc Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asha Morgan Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandra Attiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?