Edwards et al v. Haritos et al

Plaintiff: Orlando Edwards and Lee Edwards
Defendant: J Haritos, P. Park, Other Unknown Chicago Police Officers and City Of Chicago
Case Number: 1:2009cv01726
Filed: March 19, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Wayne R. Andersen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2012 137 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 3/8/2012: Mailed notice (am)
January 12, 2012 118 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendants J Haritos, P. Park for judgment as a Matter of Law pursuant to Rule 50(a) (Satoh, Reiko)
November 29, 2011 110 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 11/29/2011: The court has considered the defendants' objections to the proposed final jury instructions, preliminary jury instructions, and verdict form 109 . The defendants' objections are resolved as described in the Statement section of this order. The Plaintiffs have not filed any objections to the proposed jury instructions and verdict form. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 11/29/2011: Mailed notice (am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards et al v. Haritos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Edwards
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Neslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Edwards
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Neslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Haritos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Unknown Chicago Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?