Musa-Muaremi v. Florists' Transworld Delivery Inc. (FTD)

Plaintiff: Nadia Musa-Muaremi
Defendant: Florists' Transworld Delivery Inc. (FTD)
Case Number: 1:2009cv01824
Filed: March 24, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Kane
Presiding Judge: Joan H. Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2011 169 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 10/5/2011:Mailed notice(mad, )
July 7, 2010 122 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE entry before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: For the reasons set out below, Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration 98 and Plaintiff's Motion to Strike 111 are both denied. However, defendant's alternative motion for a prote ctive order 104 is granted as follows: Production of the documents labeled PR 4-5, PR 8, PR 9-10, and PR 11 to plaintiff's counsel is stayed until the decision of the District Judge on defendant's objection to the May 13, 2010 opinion. Notice mailed by judge's staff(ntf)
May 13, 2010 95 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 5/13/2010:Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Musa-Muaremi v. Florists' Transworld Delivery Inc. (FTD)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadia Musa-Muaremi
Represented By: John Craig Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florists' Transworld Delivery Inc. (FTD)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?