Cooney v. Casady et al

Plaintiff: Deborah Orlando Cooney
Defendant: Rhonda Casady, Andrew Sosnowski and Lesley Magnabosco
Case Number: 1:2009cv01920
Filed: March 27, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Elaine E. Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2011 231 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 3/21/2011: Mailed notice(mpj, )
October 28, 2010 213 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/28/2010:Mailed notice(mpj, )
January 21, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/21/2010:Mailed notice(mpj, )
September 11, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/11/2009:Mailed notice(mpj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooney v. Casady et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Orlando Cooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Casady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Sosnowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesley Magnabosco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?