McCadd et al v. Murphy et al

Plaintiff: Anna L. McCadd and Harold McCadd, Jr.
Defendant: William Murphy, Officer Cole, Ruben Ramirez, Unknown Chicago Police Officers and City of Chicago, the
Case Number: 1:2009cv01958
Filed: March 30, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Blanche M. Manning
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2011 121 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Plaintiffs Anna L. McCadd, Harold McCadd, Jr for judgment Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Agreed Order of Dismissal and Entry of Judgment on Fees and Costs, MOTION by Plaintiffs Anna L. McCadd, Harold McCadd, Jr for order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Feuer, Kurt)
June 14, 2011 106 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 6/14/2011: The plaintiffs' motion in limine #6 [ 86 -1] is granted in part and denied in part as detailed below. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice (ph, )
June 6, 2011 103 Opinion or Order of the Court The defendants' motions for reconsideration [98-1] and [100-1] are denied. WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 6/6/2011: Mailed notice(rth, )
June 2, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 6/2/2011: Pretrial conference held. Contrary to what was said in the pretrial conference, trial will begin at 9:30 a.m., consistent with the 2/24/2011 order. The plaintiffs shall respond to the defendants' Motion in Limine #13 [90-1] by noon on June 6, 2011; the defendants shall reply by June 7, 2011. By stipulation, defendant John Elstner is dismissed from the case with prejudice. The plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their Motion in Limine #6 [86-1] by June 7, 2011. The various issues raised during the parties' pretrial conference are resolved as detailed below. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice (ph, )
May 25, 2011 87 Opinion or Order of the Court The plaintiffs' consolidated motions in limine [77-1] are granted in part and denied in part as detailed below. The defendants' consolidated motions in limine [78-1] are granted in part, denied in part, or the court defersruling on the motion, as detailed below. WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 5/25/2011: Mailed notice(rth, )
December 21, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 12/21/2010:Mailed notice(jms, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCadd et al v. Murphy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna L. McCadd
Represented By: Kurt Henry Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold McCadd, Jr.
Represented By: Kurt Henry Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Chicago Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago, the
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?